This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 20:24:27 (UTC).

Mitchell D. Burton Construction, Inc. vs. Demers

Case Summary

On 04/30/2008 Mitchell D Burton Construction, Inc filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Demers. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

MITCHELL D BURTON CONSTRUCTION INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SIERRA PADRE MILL COMPANY

AMERICAN STANDARD SIDING

OJ INSULATION INC

DEMERS, DENISE A

VASQUEZ, SERGIO

TILE TECH INSTALLERS INC

INDUSTRIAL METAL SUPPLY COMPANY

PRO-FORM

STEVEN LOMBARDI ARCHITECT

ALESSIO HEATING & AIR INC

MIXTURE

INLAND IRON INC

FSC COATINGS INC

LAVIN, CHRIS ; DBA : BOLT SHEET METAL WORKS

WHITE HORSE WINDOWS INC

DEMERS, JOHN K

KEYSTONE ROOFING INC; ESA : KEYSTONE ROOFING

MINSHEW BROTHERS

CONCEPTS IN CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC; ESA : CONCEPTS IN CONCRETE

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MITCHELL D BURTON CONSTRUCTION INC

KEYSTONE ROOFING INC; ESA : KEYSTONE ROOFING

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

NOLAN, PAUL J

WING, PHILLIP C

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DELIS, JOHN A

SHEWRY, STEVEN M

SULLIVAN, MICHAEL

EDWARDS, MICHAEL M

HUGHES, PETER M

CZELUSNIAK, DAVID E

REINER, BRYAN

HERNQUIST II, WILLIAM C

NOLAN, PAUL J

WING, PHILLIP C

Other Attorneys

NAGPAL, VIK

WILCOXSON, JOHN G

LEWIS, DOUGLAS W

EGAN, CHARLES K

SPERLING, STEVEN D

LETOFSKY, LARRY D

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 02/06/17 - volume 1 of 2

Case File Contents as of 02/06/17 - volume 1 of 2

Case File Contents as of 02/06/17 - volume 2 of 2

Case File Contents as of 02/06/17 - volume 2 of 2

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 12/05/2008 at 11:00:00 AM at North County in N-30 Thomas P. Nugent.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/19/2009 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-30 Thomas P. Nugent.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/19/2009 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2009 at 10:30:00 AM at North County in N-30 Thomas P. Nugent.

Notice of Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/25/2009 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-30 Thomas P. Nugent.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/24/2009 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 02/05/2010 at 10:30:00 AM at North County in N-30 Thomas P. Nugent.

Notice of Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/22/2010 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-30 Thomas P. Nugent.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 05/07/2010 at 10:30:00 AM in N-30 before Thomas P. Nugent at North County.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 04/09/2010 at 10:00:00 AM in N-30 before Thomas P. Nugent at North County.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 04/12/2010 at 10:00:00 AM in N-30 before Thomas P. Nugent at North County.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 04/30/2010 at 10:00:00 AM in N-30 before Thomas P. Nugent at North County.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 05/07/2010 at 10:30:00 AM in N-30 before Thomas P. Nugent at North County.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 08/13/2010 at 10:00:00 AM in N-30 before Thomas P. Nugent at North County.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 09/10/2010 at 10:30:00 AM in N-30 before Thomas P. Nugent at North County.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 02/06/17 - volume 2 of 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 02/06/17 - volume 1 of 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • DocketNotice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Mariner Mechanical Inc. Filed By: Mariner Mechanical Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • DocketNotice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by HA Casillas Landscape. Filed By: HA Casillas Landscape (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • DocketNotice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Carroll Metal Works Inc. Filed By: Carroll Metal Works Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Mitchell D Burton Construction Inc. Filed By: Mitchell D Burton Construction Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Mitchell D Burton Construction Inc. Filed By: Mitchell D Burton Construction Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Demers, Denise A; Demers, John K. Filed By: Demers, Denise A (Cross - Complainant); Demers, John K (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 01/26/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
312 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2008
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Mitchell D. Burton Construction, Inc.. Refers to: Demers, Denise; Demers, John Filed By: Mitchell D Burton Construction Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2008
  • DocketCertificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (Extension granted to 8/15/08) filed by Mitchell D. Burton Construction, Inc.. Refers to: Demers, John Filed By: Mitchell D Burton Construction Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2008
  • DocketCertificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (Extension granted to 8/15/08) filed by Mitchell D. Burton Construction, Inc.. Refers to: Demers, John Filed By: Mitchell D Burton Construction Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (JOHN K. DEMERS) filed by Mitchell D. Burton Construction, Inc.. Refers to: Demers, John Filed By: Mitchell D Burton Construction Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (DENISE A. DEMERS) filed by Mitchell D. Burton Construction, Inc.. Refers to: Demers, Denise Filed By: Mitchell D Burton Construction Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Nugent, Thomas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mitchell D. Burton Construction, Inc.. Refers to: Demers, John; Demers, Denise Filed By: Mitchell D Burton Construction Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Mitchell D. Burton Construction, Inc.. Refers to: Demers, John; Demers, Denise Filed By: Mitchell D Burton Construction Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mitchell D. Burton Construction, Inc.. Refers to: Demers, John; Demers, Denise Filed By: Mitchell D Burton Construction Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • DocketSummons Issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less