Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/25/2021 at 01:36:08 (UTC).

MIRJAN VS SCHAUFLER

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 MIRJAN filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against SCHAUFLER. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MIRJAN, ULA

Respondents

SCHAUFLER, CYNDEL

SCHAUFLER, DANIEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-61; Event Type: Hearing on Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by MIRJAN, ULA. Filed By: MIRJAN, ULA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Firearms Turned In or Sold filed by SCHAUFLER, DANIEL. Filed By: SCHAUFLER, DANIEL (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by SCHAUFLER, DANIEL. Filed By: SCHAUFLER, DANIEL (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by MIRJAN, ULA. Refers to: BAHIA, HAITHAM; BAHIA, BASMA; BAHIA, RAWAN; BAHIA, YOUSEF; SCHAUFLER, DANIEL; SCHAUFLER, CYNDEL Filed By: MIRJAN, ULA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by MIRJAN, ULA. Refers to: BAHIA, HAITHAM; BAHIA, BASMA; BAHIA, RAWAN; BAHIA, YOUSEF; SCHAUFLER, DANIEL; SCHAUFLER, CYNDEL Filed By: MIRJAN, ULA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by MIRJAN, ULA. Filed By: MIRJAN, ULA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by MIRJAN, ULA. Refers to: SCHAUFLER, DANIEL Filed By: MIRJAN, ULA (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 04/14/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less