This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/26/2022 at 07:12:06 (UTC).

MIRANDA vs

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 MIRANDA vs was filed as a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRANDA, MARCO

Defendants

AECOM

HUNT CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yadidsion, Danny

100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 700

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by MIRANDA, MARCO. Refers to: HUNT CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC; AECOM

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by MIRANDA, MARCO. Refers to: HUNT CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC; AECOM

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by MIRANDA, MARCO. Refers to: HUNT CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC; AECOM

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by MIRANDA, MARCO. Refers to: HUNT CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC

Notice of Removal to Federal Court (Stays)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by HUNT CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by HUNT CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.; Filed By: HUNT CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by MIRANDA, MARCO. Refers to: HUNT CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC; Filed By: MIRANDA, MARCO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by MIRANDA, MARCO. Refers to: HUNT CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC; AECOM; Filed By: MIRANDA, MARCO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by MIRANDA, MARCO. Refers to: HUNT CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC; AECOM; Filed By: MIRANDA, MARCO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by MIRANDA, MARCO. Refers to: HUNT CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC; AECOM; Filed By: MIRANDA, MARCO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HUNT CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AECOM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YADIDSION DANNY