This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 00:34:27 (UTC).

Mira Mesa SHopping Center West LLc V. Nguyen dba Linda Beauty School

Case Summary

On 03/26/2018 Mira Mesa SHopping Center West LLc filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Nguyen dba Linda Beauty School. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC

Defendant

NGUYEN, DE GIA; DBA : LINDA BEAUTY SCHOOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THORN, ROBERT C

Attorney at KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

7676 Hazard Center Dr

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment (AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS) filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does (As To Does 1-10 Only) filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC.

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC.

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing

Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (Order Signed 04/03/2018) filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE

Proof of service by Posting(UD)

Proof of service by Posting(UD) filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE

Writ of Possession issued.

Writ of Possession issued.

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Filed By: MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does (As To Does 1-10 Only) filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Filed By: MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Judgment entered for MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC and against NGUYEN, DE GIA for a grand total of $ 33388.82 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE Filed By: MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Entry of Judgment (AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS) filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE Filed By: MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE Filed By: MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Judgment entered for MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC and against NGUYEN, DE GIA for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE Filed By: MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Default entered as to NGUYEN, DE GIA on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC .

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Filed By: MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service by Posting(UD) filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE Filed By: MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default and/or Judgment Received for Processing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (Order Signed 04/03/2018) filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE Filed By: MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Case assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE Filed By: MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE Filed By: MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC. Refers to: NGUYEN, DE Filed By: MIRA MESA SHOPPING CENTER WEST LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mira Mesa Shopping Center - West LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thorn, Robert C