This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/09/2018 at 11:24:13 (UTC).

Miller vs Frisbee

Case Summary

On 02/11/2015 Miller filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Frisbee. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EARL H. MAAS, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EARL H. MAAS, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Miller, F Clayton

Miller, Robert

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Frisbee, Sean

Leucadia Group LLC

Leucadia Investment Holdings Inc

Moody, Daryl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GUERENA, HEATHER U; Hollenbeck, Patricia P

101 West Broadway #900

San Diego, CA 92101

GUERENA, HEATHER U

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS LLP

750 B Street Suite 2900

San Diego, CA 92101

HOLLENBECK, PATRICIA P

Symphony Tower Llc, 750 B St

San Diego, CA 92101

HOCKER, ROBERT N

501 W Broadway 540

San Diego, CA 92101-8535

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

JANINE-PAGE, MARISA

Attorney at CALDARELLI HEJMANOWSKI PAGE & LEER LLP

12340 El Camino Real #430

San Diego, CA 92130

KNAIER, ROBERT G

550 West C Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Moody, Daryl.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Leucadia Group LLC; Frisbee, Sean.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (NOTICE OF FEDERAL BANKRUPTCY) filed by Miller, Robert.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Leucadia Group LLC; Frisbee, Sean.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (11/29/16) filed by Leucadia Group LLC; Frisbee, Sean.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 389]

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (06/09/2017) filed by Leucadia Group LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/21/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Judgment - by Court - After Trial

Judgment - by Court - After Trial filed by Miller, Robert.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/18/2015 09:00:00 AM.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Miller, F Clayton; Miller, Robert.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Leucadia Group LLC; Frisbee, Sean. Refers to: Frisbee, Sean; Leucadia Group LLC; Leucadia Investment Holdings Inc; Moody, Daryl

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Miller, Robert.

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery (01/22/2016) filed by Leucadia Group LLC; Leucadia Investment Holdings Inc; Frisbee, Sean; Moody, Daryl.

Notice of Unavailability

Notice - Other (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY) filed by Moody, Daryl; Leucadia Group LLC; Leucadia Investment Holdings Inc; Frisbee, Sean.

Order - Other

Order - Other (3/11/16) submitted by Miller, Robert received but not filed on 02/18/2016.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Moody, Daryl; Leucadia Group LLC; Leucadia Investment Holdings Inc; Frisbee, Sean.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (04/13/2016) filed by Miller, Robert.

394 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Miller, Robert. Filed By: Miller, Robert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other filed by Miller, Robert. Filed By: Miller, Robert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment - by Court - After Trial filed by Miller, Robert. Filed By: Miller, Robert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Judgment entered on 02/21/2017 was amended as follows: Judgment entered for Miller, Robert;Miller, Robert and against Frisbee, Sean;Frisbee, Sean for $ 105250.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 997700.37, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court $ .00, for a grand total of $ 1102950.37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Miller, Robert ;Miller, Robert and against Frisbee, Sean ;Frisbee, Sean for $ 0.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Miller, Robert ;Miller, Robert and against Leucadia Group LLC;Leucadia Group LLC for $ 105250.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 105250.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/21/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 07/07/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail filed by Moody, Daryl; Frisbee, Sean. Filed By: Moody, Daryl (Defendant); Frisbee, Sean (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
490 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2015
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 02/18/2015 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Ex Parte reassigned to Timothy M. Casserly for 02/18/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 02/13/2015 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/31/2015 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Miller, Robert; Miller, F Clayton. Refers to: Frisbee, Sean; Moody, Daryl; Leucadia Group LLC; Leucadia Investment Holdings Inc Filed By: Miller, Robert (Plaintiff); Miller, F Clayton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Miller, Robert; Miller, F Clayton. Refers to: Frisbee, Sean; Moody, Daryl; Leucadia Group LLC; Leucadia Investment Holdings Inc Filed By: Miller, Robert (Plaintiff); Miller, F Clayton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Miller, Robert; Miller, F Clayton. Refers to: Frisbee, Sean; Moody, Daryl; Leucadia Group LLC; Leucadia Investment Holdings Inc Filed By: Miller, Robert (Plaintiff); Miller, F Clayton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.