This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 04:47:48 (UTC).

Miller vs Douchette

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Miller filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Douchette. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miller, Tyler

Defendants

Doucette, Darin

Doucette, Dayton

Doucette, Laurie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Conrad, J Christian

Attorney at CONRAD & ASSOCIATES LLC

25241 Paseo De Alicia Suite 200

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

Defendant Attorney

Norris, Suzanne T

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A HAUSER One Pointe Drive

1 Pointe Drive 6Th Floor

Brea, CA 92821

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number (Participant Information)

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Miller, Tyler.

Proof of Service by Mail (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Miller, Tyler.

Request for Dismissal of Does (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Miller, Tyler.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/05/2022 09:00:00 AM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Doucette, Dayton.

Case Management Statement (Case Management) (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Miller, Tyler.

Proposed Order (Motions)

Order - Other (Order Dismissing Laurie Doucette and Darin Doucette) filed by Miller, Tyler. Refers to: Doucette, Darin; Doucette, Laurie

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Miller, Tyler. Refers to: Doucette, Darin; Doucette, Laurie

NOTICE OF CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESSES

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Doucette, Dayton.

DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Doucette, Dayton.

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS DAYTON DOUCHETTE UNVERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer filed by Doucette, Dayton.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Miller, Tyler. Refers to: Doucette, Darin

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Miller, Tyler. Refers to: Doucette, Dayton

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Miller, Tyler. Refers to: Doucette, Laurie

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 08/05/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 before Blaine K. Bowman at North County.

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons (**amended**) filed by Miller, Tyler. Refers to: Doucette, Darin; Doucette, Dayton; Doucette, Laurie

Amended Complaint (Amendments)

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2023
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Miller, Tyler.; Filed By: Miller, Tyler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Miller, Tyler.; Filed By: Miller, Tyler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of Does filed by Miller, Tyler.; Filed By: Miller, Tyler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/05/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketThis matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketJury demanded by Defendant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/10/2023 at 10:15AM before Judge Blaine K. Bowman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 09/15/2023 at 08:30AM before Judge Blaine K. Bowman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 9]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (**1st**) filed by Miller, Tyler. Refers to: Doucette, Dayton; Doucette, Laurie; Doucette, Darin; Filed By: Miller, Tyler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bowman, Blaine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Miller, Tyler. Refers to: Douchette, Dayton; Douchette, Laurie; Douchette, Darin; Filed By: Miller, Tyler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Miller, Tyler. Refers to: Douchette, Dayton; Douchette, Laurie; Douchette, Darin; Filed By: Miller, Tyler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Miller, Tyler. Refers to: Douchette, Dayton; Douchette, Laurie; Douchette, Darin; Filed By: Miller, Tyler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less