This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 10:28:24 (UTC).

Miller vs County of San Diego

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Miller filed an Other lawsuit against County of San Diego. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy M. Casserly and Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Timothy M. Casserly

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

Miller, Kwayde

Respondents and Defendants

County of San Diego

Elson, Daniel Joseph

Elson, Helen Azalea

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

Feit, Adam

Attorney at MARDIROSSIAN & ASSOCIATES INC

Mardirossian Law Building, 6311 Wilshire Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Welsh, Christopher J

Attorney at COUNTY COUNSEL

1600 Pacific Highway 355

San Diego, CA 92101-2469

Konoske, Gregory P

Attorney at KONOSKE AKIYAMA & BRUST LLP

16880 W Bernardo Drive 250

San Diego, CA 92127

 

Court Documents

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (TRACY DYRNESS #12323) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Miller, Kwayde. Refers to: Elson, Helen; Elson, Daniel

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Miller, Kwayde. Refers to: County of San Diego; Elson, Helen; Elson, Daniel

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 30]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 30]

Original Summons

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to Bowman,Blaine effective 05/01/2021

Defendant County of San Diego's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Answer filed by County of San Diego.

Defendant County of San Diego Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by County of San Diego.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Elson, Daniel Joseph; Elson, Helen Azalea.

Reply In Support of Petition for Order Relieving Petitioner Kwayde Miller from Gov. Code 945.4

Reply (4/9/21) filed by Miller, Kwayde.

Response to Respondent County of San Diego's Requests for Judicial Notice

Reply to Opposition - Other (4/9/21) filed by Miller, Kwayde.

Evidentiary Objections in Support of Petition for Order Relieving Kwayde Miller from Gov. Code 945.4

Objections (4/9/21) filed by Miller, Kwayde.

[Proposed] Order re Evidentiary Objections in Support of Petition for Order Relieving Kwayde Miller from Gov. Code 945.4

Proposed Order (4/9/21) submitted by Miller, Kwayde received but not filed on 04/02/2021.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/09/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Opposition/Objection of The County of San Diego to Kwayde Miller's Petition for Relief from Goverment Tort Claim Requirements

Opposition - Other (Opposition/Objection [4/9/21]) filed by County of San Diego.

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Elson, Daniel Joseph; Elson, Helen Azalea. Filed By: Elson, Daniel Joseph (Defendant); Elson, Helen Azalea (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by County of San Diego. Filed By: County of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by County of San Diego. Filed By: County of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to Bowman,Blaine effective 05/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 30]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 30]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Miller, Kwayde. Refers to: Elson, Helen; Elson, Daniel Filed By: Miller, Kwayde (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Miller, Kwayde. Refers to: County of San Diego; Elson, Helen; Elson, Daniel Filed By: Miller, Kwayde (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMatter decided.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Hearing (4/9/20) filed by Miller, Kwayde. Filed By: Miller, Kwayde (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List (4/9/20) filed by Miller, Kwayde. Filed By: Miller, Kwayde (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (4/9/20) submitted by Miller, Kwayde received but not filed on 12/08/2020. Filed By: Miller, Kwayde (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Other filed by Miller, Kwayde. Refers to: County of San Diego Filed By: Miller, Kwayde (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Miller, Kwayde. Filed By: Miller, Kwayde (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List filed by Miller, Kwayde. Filed By: Miller, Kwayde (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Miller, Kwayde received but not filed on 11/30/2020. Filed By: Miller, Kwayde (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEIT ADAM LOUIS