Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/02/2019 at 01:56:00 (UTC).

Mike Tajran vs Irene McDonald

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 Mike Tajran filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Irene McDonald. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOAN M. LEWIS and RONALD F. FRAZIER. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOAN M. LEWIS

RONALD F. FRAZIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAJRAN, DEENA

TAJRAN, MIKE

Defendants

MCDONALD, IRENE

Johnson, Keith

Estate of Irene McDonald, deceased

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUNEZ, STEVEN M

Attorney at WARD & HAGEN LLP

440 Stevens Avenue 350

Solana Beach, CA 92075

Defendant Attorney

Van De Moere, Bryce M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DAVID HOLNAGEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/23/2019 10:45:00 AM.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike. Refers to: Johnson, Keith; Estate of Irene McDonald, deceased

Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike. Refers to: Estate of Irene McDonald, deceased

First Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike. Refers to: Estate of Irene McDonald, deceased; Johnson, Keith

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike.

Ex Parte Application to Add the Personal Representative of the Deceased Defendant; Declaration of Steven Nunez

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Ex Parte Application to Add the Personal Representative of the Deceased Defendant; Declaration of Steven Nunez) filed by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike.

Proposed Order in Ex Parte to Add the Personal Representative of the Deceased Defendant

Proposed Order (Proposed Order in Ex Parte to Add the Personal Representative of the Deceased Defendant) submitted by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike received but not filed on 05/21/2019.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/23/2019 08:30:00 AM.

Order After Hearing

Order After Hearing (Order on ex parte application to add the persoanl reporesentative of the deceased defendant) filed by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike.

Notice of Civil Case Management Conference

Notice of Hearing filed by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Lewis,Joan to Frazier,Ronald effective 12/29/2018

Complaint

Complaint filed by Tajran, Mike; Tajran, Deena. Refers to: MCDONALD, IRENE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tajran, Mike; Tajran, Deena. Refers to: MCDONALD, IRENE

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Tajran, Mike; Tajran, Deena. Refers to: MCDONALD, IRENE

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/23/2019 10:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 10/25/2019 at 10:45AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Estate of Irene McDonald, deceased. Filed By: Estate of Irene McDonald, deceased (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike. Refers to: Johnson, Keith; Estate of Irene McDonald, deceased Filed By: Tajran, Deena (Plaintiff); Tajran, Mike (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike. Filed By: Tajran, Deena (Plaintiff); Tajran, Mike (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike. Refers to: Estate of Irene McDonald, deceased Filed By: Tajran, Deena (Plaintiff); Tajran, Mike (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike. Filed By: Tajran, Deena (Plaintiff); Tajran, Mike (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order After Hearing (Order on ex parte application to add the persoanl reporesentative of the deceased defendant) filed by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike. Filed By: Tajran, Deena (Plaintiff); Tajran, Mike (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/23/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 08/23/2019 at 10:45AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Tajran, Deena; Tajran, Mike. Refers to: Estate of Irene McDonald, deceased; Johnson, Keith Filed By: Tajran, Deena (Plaintiff); Tajran, Mike (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Lewis,Joan to Frazier,Ronald effective 12/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference reassigned to Frazier, Ronald for 05/24/2019 at 10:45:00 AM in C-65 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/24/2019 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Lewis, Joan.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Tajran, Mike; Tajran, Deena. Refers to: MCDONALD, IRENE Filed By: Tajran, Mike (Plaintiff); Tajran, Deena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tajran, Mike; Tajran, Deena. Refers to: MCDONALD, IRENE Filed By: Tajran, Mike (Plaintiff); Tajran, Deena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Tajran, Mike; Tajran, Deena. Refers to: MCDONALD, IRENE Filed By: Tajran, Mike (Plaintiff); Tajran, Deena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less