This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/26/2019 at 03:34:55 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Tomasromero

Case Summary

On 09/10/2012 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tomasromero. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Tomasromero, Alejandro

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brachfeld, Erica L

BROWN, TIMOTHY S

Attorney at MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

10601 G Tierrasanta Boulevard 4540

San Diego, CA 92124

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Jurisdictional Facts) filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Tomasromero, Alejandro

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Tomasromero, Alejandro

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Tomasromero, Alejandro

Judgment by Default by Clerk

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Tomasromero, Alejandro

Abstract of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Tomasromero, Alejandro Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Tomasromero, Alejandro Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (of Jurisdictional Facts) filed by Midland Funding LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Midland Funding LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Funding LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less