Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/18/2020 at 08:21:24 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs Smith

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Smith, Jeannie ; AKA : Smith, Jeannie N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARNOLD, CHRISTINA

Attorney at MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Smith, Jeannie

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Smith, Jeannie

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Smith, Jeannie

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Smith, Jeannie

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Smith, Jeannie

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Smith, Jeannie Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Smith, Jeannie Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Smith, Jeannie Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Smith, Jeannie Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Smith, Jeannie Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-26.

    Read MoreRead Less