This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/18/2021 at 08:21:03 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Sandra Rios

Case Summary

On 06/28/2011 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sandra Rios. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

RIOS, SANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ETSELL, KAREN L

Attorney at MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

350 Camino De La Reina Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) submitted by Midland Funding LLC rejected on 11/28/2011. Refers to: Rios, Sandra

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Entry of Default submitted by Midland Funding LLC rejected on 09/15/2011. Refers to: Rios, Sandra

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest fil

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs $25.00, Interest $2710.00) filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Midland Funding LLC

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Writ of Execution issued

Writ of Execution issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Midland Funding LLC.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs $25.00, Interest $2710.00) filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2011
  • Docket***Court Judgment request received***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment (and dismissal of Does) filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Rios, Sandra Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default submitted by Midland Funding LLC rejected on 09/15/2011. Refers to: Rios, Sandra Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Rios, Sandra Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • DocketDefault entered as to Rios, Sandra on Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Funding LLC .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Rios, Sandra Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • DocketComplaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Rios, Sandra Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Rios, Sandra Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department E-21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ETSELL, KAREN L