This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/25/2018 at 01:30:17 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Pender

Case Summary

On 08/10/2012 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Pender. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Pender, Lisa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brachfeld, Erica L

BROWN, TIMOTHY S

Attorney at MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

10601 G Tierrasanta Boulevard 4540

San Diego, CA 92124

 

Court Documents

Satisfaction of Judgment - full

Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Pender, Lisa

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Pender, Lisa

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Pender, Lisa

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Pender, Lisa

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Pender, Lisa

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Pender, Lisa

Judgment by Default by Clerk

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Pender, Lisa

Abstract of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Writ of Execution issued for Los Angeles County.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • *****Writ Received*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • ***Abstract Received***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Midland Funding LLC and against Pender, Lisa for $ 4241.96, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 1006.45, prejudgment costs: $ 323.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 5571.41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Pender, Lisa Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Pender, Lisa Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Pender, Lisa Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Pender, Lisa Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Pender, Lisa Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Pender, Lisa Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less