This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/02/2019 at 14:44:36 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Geoffrey Alegado

Case Summary

On 11/03/2010 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Geoffrey Alegado. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ALEGADO, GEOFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARK, RORY W

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RORY W CLARK APLC

30699 Russell Ranch Road 215

Westlake Village, CA 91362

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD

OSC - Non-Sanction scheduled for 09/20/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/11/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/13/2011 08:35:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/04/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 05/13/2011 08:35:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Non-Sanction heard 09/20/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 1

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/11/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/04/2011 08:30:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Alegado, Geoffrey, on 12/09/2010, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Alegado, Geoffrey Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Midland Funding LLC and against Alegado, Geoffrey for $ 8659.18, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 1519.17, prejudgment costs: $ 300.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 10478.35.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Alegado, Geoffrey Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • The default filed by Midland Funding LLC was entered as to Alegado, Geoffrey on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Alegado, Geoffrey Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2011
  • Motion - Other (Motion for Order that Matters in Request for Admissions be Deemed Admitted; Other Supporting Documents) filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • Discovery Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2011 at 08:35:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/04/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2010
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Alegado, Geoffrey. Filed By: Alegado, Geoffrey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Alegado, Geoffrey Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Alegado, Geoffrey Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Alegado, Geoffrey Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Alegado, Geoffrey Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.