This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 09:34:10 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs CURTSINGER

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CURTSINGER. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EARL H. MAAS, III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EARL H. MAAS, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CURTSINGER, BRIAN ; AKA : CURTSINGER, BRIAN T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SNYDER, DAVID B

Attorney at MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

10601 G Tierrasanta Boulevard 4540

San Diego, CA 92124

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. Refers to: CURTSINGER, BRIAN

Declaration of Due Diligence

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. Refers to: CURTSINGER, BRIAN

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. Refers to: CURTSINGER, BRIAN

Summons issued.

Summons issued.

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. Refers to: CURTSINGER, BRIAN

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. Refers to: CURTSINGER, BRIAN

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC rejected on 01/31/2018. Refers to: CURTSINGER, BRIAN

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (and Dismissal of Does) filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (**NOT ENTERED**) filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. Refers to: CURTSINGER, BRIAN

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 08/10/2018 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 08/10/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 08/10/2018 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 08/10/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court submitted by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC rejected on 01/31/2018. Refers to: CURTSINGER, BRIAN Filed By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (**NOT ENTERED**) filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. Refers to: CURTSINGER, BRIAN Filed By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (and Dismissal of Does) filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. Filed By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. Refers to: CURTSINGER, BRIAN Filed By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. Refers to: CURTSINGER, BRIAN Filed By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. Refers to: CURTSINGER, BRIAN Filed By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. Refers to: CURTSINGER, BRIAN Filed By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC. Refers to: CURTSINGER, BRIAN Filed By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER, DAVID B.