This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 08:32:05 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Bishop

Case Summary

On 04/12/2012 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bishop. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Bishop, Ryan D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Walsh, Mark D

ETSELL, KAREN L

Attorney at MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

10601 G Tierrasanta Boulevard 4540

San Diego, CA 92124

 

Court Documents

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Bishop, Ryan

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Bishop, Ryan

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Bishop, Ryan

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Bishop, Ryan

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Bishop, Ryan

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Bishop, Ryan

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Bishop, Ryan

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Bishop, Ryan

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Midland Funding LLC.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC. Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • *****Writ Received*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Midland Funding LLC and against Bishop, Ryan D for $ 2296.68, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 240.50, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 2537.18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • The default filed by Midland Funding LLC was entered as to Bishop, Ryan D on Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Midland Funding LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Midland Funding LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Bishop, Ryan Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Midland Funding LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Venue filed by Midland Funding LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Funding LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.