This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2022 at 08:03:42 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc vs URRUTIA

Case Summary

On 03/02/2022 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against URRUTIA. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

Defendant

URRUTIA, DOLORES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saglio-Ruiz, Abril F

350 Camino De La Reina Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorney

Cardona Loya II, Octavio

Attorney at GOLDEN & CARDONA LOYA LLP

3130 Bonita Rd #200B

Chula Vista, CA 91910

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Declaration Re: Venue

Declaration - Other filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: URRUTIA, DOLORES

Declaration Re: Fee

Declaration - Other filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: URRUTIA, DOLORES

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: URRUTIA, DOLORES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: URRUTIA, DOLORES

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: URRUTIA, DOLORES

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: URRUTIA, DOLORES

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc.

Answer to Complaint with Reduced Filing Fee

Answer to Complaint with Reduced Filing Fee filed by URRUTIA, DOLORES.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from C-61 to Gregory Pollack effective 04/12/2022

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from C-61 to Gregory Pollack effective 04/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint with Reduced Filing Fee filed by URRUTIA, DOLORES.; Filed By: URRUTIA, DOLORES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc.; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: URRUTIA, DOLORES; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: URRUTIA, DOLORES; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: URRUTIA, DOLORES; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: URRUTIA, DOLORES; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: URRUTIA, DOLORES; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: URRUTIA, DOLORES; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cardona Loya II, Octavio