This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 03:46:25 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc vs Sevilla

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sevilla. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

Defendant

Sevilla, Carla B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARNOLD, CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Sevilla, Carla

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc.

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Sevilla, Carla

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Sevilla, Carla

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Sevilla, Carla

Declaration Re: Fee

Declaration - Other filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Sevilla, Carla

Declaration Re: Venue

Declaration - Other filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Sevilla, Carla

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Sevilla, Carla Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Sevilla, Carla Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Sevilla, Carla Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Sevilla, Carla Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Sevilla, Carla Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Sevilla, Carla Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant