This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 11:15:13 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc vs Harrison

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Harrison. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

Defendant

Harrison, John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Graves, Mishaela J

350 Camino De La Reina Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Declaration Re: Venue

Declaration - Other filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Harrison, John

Declaration Re: Fee

Declaration - Other filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Harrison, John

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Harrison, John

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Harrison, John

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Harrison, John

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Harrison, John

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Harrison, John

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Harrison, John Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Harrison, John Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Harrison, John Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Harrison, John Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Harrison, John Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Harrison, John Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Harrison, John Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MISHAELA J GRAVES