This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/10/2020 at 03:51:29 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management INC vs Binder

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Midland Credit Management INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Binder. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

Defendant

Binder, Bonnie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Metzger, Shana J.

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Binder, Bonnie

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Binder, Bonnie

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Binder, Bonnie

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Binder, Bonnie

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Binder, Bonnie

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Binder, Bonnie Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Binder, Bonnie Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Binder, Bonnie Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Binder, Bonnie Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Midland Credit Management Inc. Refers to: Binder, Bonnie Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.