This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/12/2022 at 09:09:13 (UTC).

Mid-Century Insurance Company vs King

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 Mid-Century Insurance Company filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against King. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Mangione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

James A Mangione

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mid-Century Insurance Company

Defendant

King, Matthew ; DBA : Monarch Landscape LLC;DBA : Monarch Landscape

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hettena, Alexander V

Attorney at THE HETTENA LAW FIRM

Westlake Village Industrial Park, 31348 Via Colinas #106

Westlake Village, CA 91362

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company. Refers to: King, Matthew

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company. Refers to: King, Matthew

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company. Refers to: King, Matthew

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company.

Affidavit of Reasonable DIligence

Affidavit - Other filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit - Other filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company.; Filed By: Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company.; Filed By: Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Mangione, James.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company. Refers to: King, Matthew; Filed By: Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company. Refers to: King, Matthew; Filed By: Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company. Refers to: King, Matthew; Filed By: Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HETTENA ALEXANDER V