This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/11/2018 at 13:43:55 (UTC).

Michael Parsons vs. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 06/05/2015 Michael Parsons filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN S. MEYER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN S. MEYER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Parsons, Michael

LEONARD J ACKERMAN CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Brown, Michael

Chrysler Group LLC; FKA : FCA US LLC

FCA US LLC; FKA : Chrysler Group LLC

Johnson Controls Inc

Whited, Jonathan

FAURECIA SIEGES D'AUTOMOBILE

FAURECIA USA HOLDINGS INC

FAURECIA SA

FAURECIA AUTOMOTIVE SEATING LLC

FAURECIA AUTOMOTIVE SEATING LLC; FKA : FAURECIA AUTOMOTIVE SEATING INC

FAURECIA SIEGES D'AUTOMOBILE; AKA : FAURECIA AUTOMOTIVE SEATING EUROPE

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chambers II, Robert J; McClellan, Craig R

1144 State Street

San Diego, CA 92101

MCCLELLAN, CRAIG R

1144 State St

San Diego, CA 92101

CHAMBERS II, ROBERT J

Attorney at CHAMBERS LAW APLC

1144 State St

San Diego, CA 92101

GILBERT, JAMES L

Attorney at THE GILBERT LAW GROUP PC

5400 Ward Road, Building Iv, #200

Arvada, CO 80002

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHIRM, BARRY RAYMOND

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL THACKSTON & YOUNG LLP

Union Bank Plaza, 445 S Figueroa St

Los Angeles, CA 90071

FERAK, TRACY G

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

191 N Upper Wacker Dr # 3700

Chicago, IL 60606

WHITT, JEFFREY B

SANGDAHL, KARLIN E

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

10 S Wacker Drive 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

TURNER, VICKIE E

Attorney at WILSON TURNER KOSMO LLP

550 West C Street Suite 1050

San Diego, CA 92101-3532

HACKWORTH, MICHAEL

4590 Allstate Dr

Riverside, CA 92501

GILREATH, DANA M

Attorney at CLINTON & CLINTON

100 Oceangate Suite 1400

Long Beach, CA 90802

RODMAN, DANIEL S

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER LLP

600 Anton Boulevard 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

Original Summons

Original Summons (Second-Issued on 5-6-2016) filed by Parsons, Michael; Leonard J Ackerman Chapter 7 Trustee.

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by Leonard J Ackerman Chapter 7 Trustee; Parsons, Michael. Refers to: Faurecia USA Holdings Inc

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by Leonard J Ackerman Chapter 7 Trustee; Parsons, Michael. Refers to: Faurecia Sieges D'Automobile

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (OF JAMES LOFTUS ESQ RE : FAURECIA ENTITIES) filed by Faurecia Automotive Seating LLC.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Johnson Controls Inc.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (Proof of Service by Mail) filed by Johnson Controls Inc.

Original Summons

Original Summons (cross-complaint - issued 7-19-16) filed by Faurecia Automotive Seating LLC.

Order - Other

Order - Other (GRANTING THE VERIFIED APPLICATION OF TRACY G. FERAK TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANT JOHNSON CONTROLS INC) filed by Johnson Controls Inc.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Johnson Controls Inc.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Notice of Conditional Settlement

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Leonard J Ackerman Chapter 7 Trustee; Parsons, Michael. Refers to: Brown, Michael; Whited, Jonathan; Johnson Controls Inc; Chrysler Group LLC; FCA US LLC; Faurecia Automotive Seating LLC; Faurecia USA Holdings Inc; Faurecia SA; Faurecia Sieges D'Automobile

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Leonard J Ackerman Chapter 7 Trustee; Parsons, Michael. Refers to: FCA US LLC

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Parsons, Michael.

Proposed Order

Order - Other (Proposed Order) submitted by Parsons, Michael received but not filed on 10/26/2015.

Order - Other

Order - Other (GRANTING PLAINTIF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FILING FAC NUNC PRO TUNC) filed by Parsons, Michael.

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Whited, Jonathan .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Leonard J Ackerman Chapter 7 Trustee; Parsons, Michael. Refers to: Whited, Jonathan Filed By: Leonard J Ackerman Chapter 7 Trustee (Plaintiff); Parsons, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 02/16/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Johnson Controls Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Faurecia Automotive Seating LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Leonard J Ackerman Chapter 7 Trustee; Parsons, Michael. Refers to: Johnson Controls Inc; Faurecia Automotive Seating LLC Filed By: Leonard J Ackerman Chapter 7 Trustee (Plaintiff); Parsons, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Proposed Order) submitted by Parsons, Michael received but not filed on 10/26/2015. Filed By: Parsons, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Parsons, Michael. Filed By: Parsons, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 10/28/2015 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/27/2016 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Parsons, Michael. Refers to: FCA US LLC; Chrysler Group LLC; Johnson Controls Inc; Brown, Michael; Whited, Jonathan Filed By: Parsons, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Parsons, Michael. Refers to: FCA US LLC; Chrysler Group LLC; Johnson Controls Inc; Brown, Michael; Whited, Jonathan Filed By: Parsons, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Parsons, Michael. Refers to: FCA US LLC; Chrysler Group LLC; Johnson Controls Inc; Brown, Michael; Whited, Jonathan Filed By: Parsons, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less