This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/23/2020 at 01:35:36 (UTC).

Michael P Meo vs. Charles Vollrath

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Michael P Meo filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Charles Vollrath. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-EC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Meo, Michael P

Respondent

Vollrath, Charles

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketRestraining order as requested denied with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 10/13/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Vollrath, Charles. Refers to: Meo, Michael Filed By: Vollrath, Charles (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Response By Mail filed by Vollrath, Charles. Refers to: Meo, Michael Filed By: Vollrath, Charles (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Meo, Michael P. Refers to: Vollrath, Charles Filed By: Meo, Michael P (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Meo, Michael P. Refers to: Vollrath, Charles Filed By: Meo, Michael P (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Meo, Michael P. Refers to: Vollrath, Charles Filed By: Meo, Michael P (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Meo, Michael P. Refers to: Vollrath, Charles Filed By: Meo, Michael P (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 10/13/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

    Read MoreRead Less