This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 05:08:23 (UTC).

Michael L McChristian vs. Breckenridge Property Fund 2016

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Michael L McChristian filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against Breckenridge Property Fund 2016. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Petitioner

McChristian, Michael L

Respondents

CLEAR RECON

Ditech

Breckenridge Property Fund 2016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Cox, Seth P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by McChristian, Michael L, on 01/23/2020, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate dismissed with prejudice as to McChristian, Michael L .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate dismissed with prejudice as to Breckenridge Property Fund 2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate dismissed with prejudice as to Ditech.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate dismissed with prejudice as to CLEAR RECON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment of Dismissal filed by Breckenridge Property Fund 2016. Refers to: McChristian, Michael Filed By: Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail (re: Notice of Status Conference as to Self Represented Petitioner) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: McChristian, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail (re: Notice of Status Conference as to Self Represented Petitioner) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: McChristian, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by Breckenridge Property Fund 2016. Filed By: Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/17/2020 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Breckenridge Property Fund 2016. Filed By: Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (Notice of Hearing for Writ of Mandate) filed by McChristian, Michael L. Filed By: McChristian, Michael L (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by McChristian, Michael L. Refers to: Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 Filed By: McChristian, Michael L (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by McChristian, Michael L. Filed By: McChristian, Michael L (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed by McChristian, Michael L. Refers to: Breckenridge Property Fund 2016; Ditech; CLEAR RECON Filed By: McChristian, Michael L (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by McChristian, Michael L. Refers to: Breckenridge Property Fund 2016; Ditech; CLEAR RECON Filed By: McChristian, Michael L (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by McChristian, Michael L. Filed By: McChristian, Michael L (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DITECH A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BRECKENRIDGE PROPERTY FUND 2016, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COX SETH P. ESQ.