This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:38:05 (UTC).

Michael Corley vs KB Home Coastal Inc

Case Summary

On 07/24/2014 Michael Corley filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB Home Coastal Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Baxter, Michael

Corley, Gabriela

Corley, Michael

GUTIERREZ, LINDA

Gallagher, Ryan

Gallagher, Vera

Gutierrez, Gregory

Perotti, Rosa

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KB Home Coastal Inc

CONCRETE CONCEPTS, INC.

TEAM HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING, INC.

RKJ PREMIER DESIGN & PAINTING, INC.

PRO WALL LATH & PLASTER

LARRY METHVIN INSTALLATIONS INC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CONCRETE CONCEPTS, INC.

CROWN SHEET METAL, INC.

NISSHO OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

RCR PLUMBING & MECHANICAL, INC.

FALCON FRAMING COMPANY, INC.

RANCHO WEST LANDSCAPE, INC.

TEAM HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING, INC.

MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA; DBA : SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS, INC.

RKJ PREMIER DESIGN & PAINTING, INC.

PRO WALL LATH & PLASTER

LARRY METHVIN INSTALLATIONS INC

65 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adelman, Fred M

Attorney at MILSTEIN JACKSON FAIRCHILD & WADE LLP

2800 Donald Douglas Loop North, Santa Monica Municipal Airport

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

VERMA, JOY

Attorney at LORBER GREENFIELD & POLITO

13985 Stowe Dr

Poway, CA 92064

HARRIS, CHERRIE DELL

Attorney at LORBER GREENFIELD & POLITO LLP

13985 Stowe Dr

Poway, CA 92064

PION-GOUREAU, AMANDA E

MCCLAIN, ROBYN S

3655 Nobel 400

San Diego, CA 92122

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PION-GOUREAU, AMANDA E

MCCLAIN, ROBYN S

3655 Nobel 400

San Diego, CA 92122

MOORE, DONNA

Other Attorneys

FLAHERTY, DOUGLAS P

Attorney at FLAHERTY & FLAHERTY APLC

402 West Broadway 800

San Diego, CA 92101

LA SALLE, SCOTT

650 Town Center Drive 100

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

TERRILL, ELIZABETH

KITCHEN, CYNTHIA

Attorney at CHEN HORWITZ & FRANKLIN

12655 W Jefferson Boulevard 4Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90066

SIEGEL, MARK

7700 Irvine Center Drive Suite 275

Irvine, CA 92618

ARMIJO, MARK S

7700 Irvine Center Drive Suite 275

Irvine, CA 92618

AGUILERA, A ERIC

SAREEN, NEHA

RESURRECCION, TREVOR O

BATES, CHRISTOPHER P

Attorney at LYNBERG & WATKINS APC

1150 South Olive Street 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90015

NORRIS, SUZANNE T

SCHROEDER, ERIN E

BUREK, LAWRENCE MICHAEL

550 N Parkcenter Drive Drive 204

Santa Ana, CA 92705

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

Attorney at HAMMONS & BALDINO LLP

2601 Airport Drive 105

Torrance, CA 90505

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by KB Home Coastal Inc.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by St Paul Mercury Insurance Company. Refers to: REM Concepts, Inc.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by KB Home Coastal Inc.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (with prejudice as to the complaint) filed by PARKER, CARMEN; Corley, Gabriela; Corley, Michael; PARKER, RICHARD.

Proposed Order for Determination of Good Faith

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (Proposed Order for Determination of Good Faith) submitted by Crown Sheet Metal Inc received but not filed on 02/22/2018.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by St Paul Mercury Insurance Company; St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Refers to: Petersen-Dean Inc

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Gutierrez, Gregory; GUTIERREZ, LINDA; Corley, Michael; Corley, Gabriela; Gallagher, Ryan; Gallagher, Vera; Baxter, Michael; Perotti, Rosa.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Refers to: Larry Methvin Installations Inc

[PROPOSED] ORDER RE: MOTION TO INTERVENE BY ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ST. PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Proposed Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER RE: MOTION TO INTERVENE BY ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY AND ST. PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY) submitted by St Paul Mercury Insurance Company; St Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company received but not filed on 12/13/2016.

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement submitted by Hondo Electric, Inc. received but not filed on 08/02/2017.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Corley, Michael; Corley, Gabriela; Gallagher, Ryan; Gallagher, Vera; Gutierrez, Gregory; GUTIERREZ, LINDA; Baxter, Michael; Perotti, Rosa. Refers to: KB Home Coastal Inc

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 05/19/2017 08:30:00 AM.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by St Paul Mercury Insurance Company. Refers to: Inland Iron, Inc.

Objections

[Another document for ROA# 652]

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH M. TERRILL IN SUPPORT OF RANCHO WEST LANDSCAPE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES

Notice of Errata filed by Rancho West Landscape Inc.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company; St Paul Mercury Insurance Company received but not filed on 09/09/2016.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by KB Home Coastal Inc.

486 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • Complaint in Intervention dismissed without prejudice as to St Paul Mercury Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Complaint in Intervention dismissed without prejudice as to St Paul Mercury Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Complaint in Intervention dismissed without prejudice as to St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Complaint in Intervention dismissed without prejudice as to St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Complaint in Intervention dismissed without prejudice as to Masco Contractor Services of California.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Complaint in Intervention dismissed without prejudice as to Western Insulation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Complaint in Intervention dismissed without prejudice as to The Masonry Group, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Complaint in Intervention dismissed without prejudice as to Sunset West Framing, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Complaint in Intervention dismissed without prejudice as to Southcoast Waterproofing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Complaint in Intervention dismissed without prejudice as to South Coast Equipment, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
689 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed by KB Home Coastal Inc. Refers to: American Door Trim & Supply Inc; Blue Ribbon Stairs, Inc.; CNSE Countertops, Inc.; LLP Concrete Inc; Concrete Concepts, Inc.; Crown Sheet Metal Inc; Custom Quality Millwork, Inc.; Falcon Framing Company Inc; Fenceworks, Inc.; Hondo Electric, Inc.; Inland Iron, Inc.; Jenstar Enterprises, Inc.; Josh Parkinson Painting; Larry Methvin Installations Inc; Leonard's Carpet Service, Inc.; Truteam of California Inc; Mayer Roofing, Inc.; New Vision Drywall Inc; Nissho of California, Inc.; Pacific Coast Drywall Inc; Pacific Production Plumbing; Petersen-Dean Inc; Pro Wall Lath & Plaster; Rancho West Landscape Inc; RCR Plumbing & Mechanical Inc; Regal Cultured Marble Inc; REM Concepts, Inc.; Rescom Overhead Doors, Inc.; RKJ Premier Design & Painting, Inc.; South Coast Equipment, Inc.; Southcoast Waterproofing; Sunset West Framing, Inc.; Team Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc.; The Masonry Group, Inc.; Tomkins Industries Inc; Western Insulation; Pacific Coast Drywall & Paint, Inc.; Western Insulation LP; Walker Wood Products; Coastal Concrete Innovations Filed By: KB Home Coastal Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by KB Home Coastal Inc. Filed By: KB Home Coastal Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Gutierrez, Gregory; GUTIERREZ, LINDA; Corley, Michael; Corley, Gabriela; Gallagher, Ryan; Gallagher, Vera; Baxter, Michael; Perotti, Rosa. Refers to: KB Home Coastal Inc Filed By: Gutierrez, Gregory (Plaintiff); GUTIERREZ, LINDA (Plaintiff); Corley, Michael (Plaintiff); Corley, Gabriela (Plaintiff); Gallagher, Ryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/26/2014 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Corley, Michael; Corley, Gabriela; Gallagher, Ryan; Gallagher, Vera; Gutierrez, Gregory; GUTIERREZ, LINDA; Baxter, Michael; Perotti, Rosa. Refers to: KB Home Coastal Inc Filed By: Corley, Michael (Plaintiff); Corley, Gabriela (Plaintiff); Gallagher, Ryan (Plaintiff); Gallagher, Vera (Plaintiff); Gutierrez, Gregory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Corley, Michael; Corley, Gabriela; Gallagher, Ryan; Gallagher, Vera; Gutierrez, Gregory; GUTIERREZ, LINDA; Baxter, Michael; Perotti, Rosa. Refers to: KB Home Coastal Inc Filed By: Corley, Michael (Plaintiff); Corley, Gabriela (Plaintiff); Gallagher, Ryan (Plaintiff); Gallagher, Vera (Plaintiff); Gutierrez, Gregory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Corley, Michael; Corley, Gabriela; Gallagher, Ryan; Gallagher, Vera; Gutierrez, Gregory; GUTIERREZ, LINDA; Baxter, Michael; Perotti, Rosa. Refers to: KB Home Coastal Inc Filed By: Corley, Michael (Plaintiff); Corley, Gabriela (Plaintiff); Gallagher, Ryan (Plaintiff); Gallagher, Vera (Plaintiff); Gutierrez, Gregory (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less