Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 06:55:04 (UTC).

Mica Lindsey Myers vs. Amanda Asprion

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Mica Lindsey Myers filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Amanda Asprion. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-EC

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Myers, Mica Lindsey

Respondents

Resuiltay, Frank

Asprion, Amanda

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/04/2020 08:30:00 AM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketRestraining order as requested denied with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention)(Cross Petition) dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order set for 2/26/20 at 8:30am vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/04/2020 08:30:00 AM. (As Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Asprion, Amanda. Refers to: Myers, Mica Filed By: Asprion, Amanda (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) (Cross Petition) filed by Asprion, Amanda. Refers to: Myers, Mica Filed By: Asprion, Amanda (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (Cross Petition) filed by Asprion, Amanda. Refers to: Myers, Mica Filed By: Asprion, Amanda (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 02/26/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Amanda Asprion) filed by Myers, Mica Lindsey. Refers to: Asprion, Amanda; Anderson, Rayden; Myers-Garcia, Romeo Filed By: Myers, Mica Lindsey (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Myers, Mica Lindsey. Refers to: Asprion, Amanda; Resuiltay, Frank; Anderson, Rayden; Myers-Garcia, Romeo Filed By: Myers, Mica Lindsey (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Myers, Mica Lindsey. Refers to: Asprion, Amanda Filed By: Myers, Mica Lindsey (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Myers, Mica Lindsey. Refers to: Asprion, Amanda Filed By: Myers, Mica Lindsey (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 02/04/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

    Read MoreRead Less