This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/20/2023 at 08:07:34 (UTC).

Meyer vs Smart & Final Stores LLC

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Meyer filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Smart Final Stores LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Meyer, John

Meyer, Kimberley

Defendants

Chedraui USA Inc

Smart & Final LLC

Smart & Final Stores LLC; ESA : Smart & Final LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hulburt, Christian R

Defendant Attorney

STONE, GREGORY E

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Meyer, John; Meyer, Kimberley. Refers to: Smart & Final Stores LLC; Smart & Final LLC; Chedraui USA Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Meyer, John; Meyer, Kimberley. Refers to: Smart & Final Stores LLC; Smart & Final LLC; Chedraui USA Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Meyer, John; Meyer, Kimberley. Refers to: Smart & Final Stores LLC; Smart & Final LLC; Chedraui USA Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of Summons on Chedraui USA Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Meyer, John; Meyer, Kimberley. Refers to: Chedraui USA Inc

Proof of Service of Summons on Smart and Final Stores LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Meyer, John; Meyer, Kimberley. Refers to: Smart & Final Stores LLC

Proof of Service of Summons on Smart and Final LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Meyer, John; Meyer, Kimberley. Refers to: Smart & Final LLC

First Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Meyer, John; Meyer, Kimberley. Refers to: Smart & Final Stores LLC; Smart & Final LLC; Chedraui USA Inc

Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Chedraui USA Inc; Smart & Final Stores LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Chedraui USA Inc; Smart & Final Stores LLC.; Filed By: Chedraui USA Inc (Defendant); Smart & Final Stores LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by Meyer, John; Meyer, Kimberley. Refers to: Smart & Final Stores LLC; Smart & Final LLC; Chedraui USA Inc; Filed By: Meyer, John (Plaintiff); Meyer, Kimberley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Meyer, John; Meyer, Kimberley. Refers to: Smart & Final LLC; Filed By: Meyer, John (Plaintiff); Meyer, Kimberley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Meyer, John; Meyer, Kimberley. Refers to: Smart & Final Stores LLC; Filed By: Meyer, John (Plaintiff); Meyer, Kimberley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Meyer, John; Meyer, Kimberley. Refers to: Chedraui USA Inc; Filed By: Meyer, John (Plaintiff); Meyer, Kimberley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/05/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Meyer, John; Meyer, Kimberley. Refers to: Smart & Final Stores LLC; Smart & Final LLC; Chedraui USA Inc; Filed By: Meyer, John (Plaintiff); Meyer, Kimberley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Meyer, John; Meyer, Kimberley. Refers to: Smart & Final Stores LLC; Smart & Final LLC; Chedraui USA Inc; Filed By: Meyer, John (Plaintiff); Meyer, Kimberley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Meyer, John; Meyer, Kimberley. Refers to: Smart & Final Stores LLC; Smart & Final LLC; Chedraui USA Inc; Filed By: Meyer, John (Plaintiff); Meyer, Kimberley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less