This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 05:59:01 (UTC).

Merrill vs SOLOMON

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Merrill filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOLOMON. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy M. Casserly and Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Timothy M. Casserly

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Merrill, James K.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Independent Financial Group, LLC

Solomon, Brian H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Curran, Michael D

MAURIELLO, THOMAS D

Attorney at FORTIS LLP

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1530

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Martin, Justin M

Attorney at PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH LLP

Union Bank Of California Building, 525 B St #2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Brizolis, Alex G

Attorney at PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH LLP

525 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/16/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Substitution of Attorney (Participant Information)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Merrill, James K..

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Merrill, James K..

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to Bowman,Blaine effective 05/01/2021

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Merrill, James K..

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Merrill, James K..

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/13/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (not entered) filed by Merrill, James K.. Refers to: Independent Financial Group, LLC

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Merrill, James K..

Stipulation re Protective Order- Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation for protective order) filed by Solomon, Brian H.; Merrill, James K..

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Solomon, Brian H.; Merrill, James K..

Request for Dismissal (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (**only Complaint **) filed by Merrill, James K.. Refers to: Solomon, Brian; Independent Financial Group, LLC

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General) (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Merrill, James K..

Request for Dismissal of Cross-Complaint

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (**only Cross Complaint 1/19/2021**) filed by Solomon, Brian H.. Refers to: Merrill, James

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Solomon, Brian H..

Notice of Entry of Dismissal re Cross Complaint

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Solomon, Brian H..

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Solomon, Brian H..

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Solomon, Brian H.. Filed By: Solomon, Brian H. (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (**only Cross Complaint 1/19/2021**) filed by Solomon, Brian H.. Refers to: Merrill, James Filed By: Solomon, Brian H. (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Solomon, Brian H.. Filed By: Solomon, Brian H. (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Solomon, Brian H. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Merrill, James K. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Independent Financial Group, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Solomon, Brian H. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Merrill, James K. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (**only Complaint **) filed by Merrill, James K.. Refers to: Solomon, Brian; Independent Financial Group, LLC Filed By: Merrill, James K. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Solomon, Brian H.. Filed By: Solomon, Brian H. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Solomon, Brian H.. Refers to: Merrill, James Filed By: Solomon, Brian H. (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Solomon, Brian H.. Filed By: Solomon, Brian H. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Merrill, James K.. Refers to: Solomon, Brian; Independent Financial Group, LLC Filed By: Merrill, James K. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Merrill, James K.. Refers to: Solomon, Brian; Independent Financial Group, LLC Filed By: Merrill, James K. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Merrill, James K.. Refers to: Solomon, Brian; Independent Financial Group, LLC Filed By: Merrill, James K. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Independent Financial Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Justin M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brizolis, Alex G