This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 13:27:58 (UTC).

Mercury Casualty Company vs Mateus

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 Mercury Casualty Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Mateus. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy Taylor and Katherine Bacal. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Timothy Taylor

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mercury Casualty Company

Defendants

Alexandre, Luciano

Mateus, Barbara

Mateus, Ermelindo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Connor, Lee P

Defendant Attorney

CLOSSON, ROBERT V

Attorney at HIRSCH CLOSSON APLC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/11/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/11/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 09/11/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Stipulation to Stay Action and (Proposed) Order

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation to Stay Declaratory Relief Action and Order) filed by Mercury Casualty Company; Mateus, Barbara; Mateus, Ermelindo; Alexandre, Luciano.

Stipulation to Stay Action and (Proposed) Order

[Another document for ROA# 16]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to Katherine Bacal effective 03/02/2020

Peremptory Challenge by Defendants Mateus

Peremptory Challenge filed by Mateus, Barbara; Mateus, Ermelindo.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Mercury Casualty Company. Refers to: Mateus, Ermelindo

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Mercury Casualty Company. Refers to: Mateus, Barbara

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Mercury Casualty Company. Refers to: Alexandre, Luciano

Complaint for Declaratory Relief

Complaint filed by Mercury Casualty Company. Refers to: Mateus, Barbara; Mateus, Ermelindo; Alexandre, Luciano

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mercury Casualty Company. Refers to: Mateus, Barbara; Mateus, Ermelindo; Alexandre, Luciano

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Mercury Casualty Company. Refers to: Mateus, Barbara; Mateus, Ermelindo; Alexandre, Luciano

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Status Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to stipulation to 04/23/2021 at 09:00AM before Judge Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 09/11/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/11/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/11/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 16]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/11/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation to Stay Declaratory Relief Action and Order) filed by Mercury Casualty Company; Mateus, Barbara; Mateus, Ermelindo; Alexandre, Luciano. Filed By: Mercury Casualty Company (Plaintiff); Mateus, Barbara (Defendant); Mateus, Ermelindo (Defendant); Alexandre, Luciano (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Mercury Casualty Company. Refers to: Mateus, Ermelindo Filed By: Mercury Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Mercury Casualty Company. Refers to: Mateus, Barbara Filed By: Mercury Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Mercury Casualty Company. Refers to: Alexandre, Luciano Filed By: Mercury Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mercury Casualty Company. Refers to: Mateus, Barbara; Mateus, Ermelindo; Alexandre, Luciano Filed By: Mercury Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mercury Casualty Company. Refers to: Mateus, Barbara; Mateus, Ermelindo; Alexandre, Luciano Filed By: Mercury Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Mercury Casualty Company. Refers to: Mateus, Barbara; Mateus, Ermelindo; Alexandre, Luciano Filed By: Mercury Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'CONNOR LEE PATRICK