This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/21/2023 at 07:07:36 (UTC).

Mendez Chavez vs Bautista-Bernal

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 Mendez Chavez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bautista-Bernal. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Escobar, Marco

Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina

Defendants

Bautista-Bernal, Miguel A; DBA : Carros A Credito

Hudson Insurance Company

Westlake Services LLC; DBA : Westlake Financial Services

Cars on Credit Enterprise

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sadr, Kasra

1455 Frazee Rd Suite 500

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina; Escobar, Marco. Refers to: Bautista-Bernal, Miguel; Westlake Services LLC; Hudson Insurance Company

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina; Escobar, Marco. Refers to: Bautista-Bernal, Miguel; Westlake Services LLC; Hudson Insurance Company

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Motion to Compel Arbitration

Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina; Escobar, Marco.

Declaration Of Nima Heydari In Support Of Plaintiffs Petition To Compel Arbitration

Declaration - Other (Of Nima Heydari) filed by Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina; Escobar, Marco.

Proposed Order granting plaintiffs motion to compel

Proposed Order submitted by Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina; Escobar, Marco received but not filed on 01/12/2023.

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina; Escobar, Marco. Refers to: Cars on Credit Enterprise

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina; Escobar, Marco. Refers to: Cars on Credit Enterprise; Filed By: Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina (Plaintiff); Escobar, Marco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina; Escobar, Marco received but not filed on 01/12/2023.; Filed By: Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina (Plaintiff); Escobar, Marco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Of Nima Heydari) filed by Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina; Escobar, Marco.; Filed By: Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina (Plaintiff); Escobar, Marco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery filed by Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina; Escobar, Marco.; Filed By: Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina (Plaintiff); Escobar, Marco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina; Escobar, Marco. Refers to: Bautista-Bernal, Miguel; Westlake Services LLC; Hudson Insurance Company; Filed By: Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina (Plaintiff); Escobar, Marco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina; Escobar, Marco. Refers to: Bautista-Bernal, Miguel; Westlake Services LLC; Hudson Insurance Company; Filed By: Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina (Plaintiff); Escobar, Marco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina; Escobar, Marco. Refers to: Bautista-Bernal, Miguel; Westlake Services LLC; Hudson Insurance Company; Cars on Credit Enterprise; Filed By: Mendez Chavez, Anahi Cristina (Plaintiff); Escobar, Marco (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less