This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/25/2021 at 11:31:59 (UTC).

Mehta vs Jimenez

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 Mehta filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jimenez. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Mehta MD, Ritvik P; DBA : California Head & Neck Specialists

Mehta MD, Ritvik P

RITVIK P MEHTA MD APC; DBA : California Head & Neck Specialists

San Diego Surgical Corporation

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Jimenez, Carlos F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Dillon, Timothy P

GRACCO, CHRISTINE J

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Fraser, Esther

 

Court Documents

Supplemental Declaration of R. Mehta

Declaration - Other filed by Mehta MD, Ritvik P.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Carrie Bolding #7795) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Jimenez, Carlos F.

Declaration of Demurring Party In Support of Automatic Extension

Declaration - Other filed by Mehta MD, Ritvik P.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/18/2021 08:45:00 AM.

Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction

Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mehta MD, Ritvik P.

Declaration of Christine Gracco

Declaration - Other (of Christine J Gracco in support of motion for preliminary injunction) filed by Mehta MD, Ritvik P.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (granting order on preliminary injunction) submitted by Mehta MD, Ritvik P received but not filed on 09/11/2020.

Answer

Answer filed by Jimenez, Carlos F.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Jimenez, Carlos F.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Dr Carlos Jimenez in support of opposition to motion for preliminary injunction) filed by Jimenez, Carlos F.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (opposition, declaration, proposed order) filed by Jimenez, Carlos F.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Jimenez, Carlos F.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/28/2020 08:45:00 AM.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (to show cause regarding preliminary injunction) submitted by Mehta MD, Ritvik P received but not filed on 07/21/2020.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Mehta MD, Ritvik P. Refers to: Jimenez, Carlos

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Re Defendants Ex Parte Application to Stay all proceedings until April 1 2021 When Counsel Returns from Maternity Leave and Cancel the Subpoena Issued to the California Medical Board) filed by Jimenez, Carlos F. Filed By: Jimenez, Carlos F (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/18/2021 08:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition - Other (to ex parte to stay) filed by Mehta MD, Ritvik P. Filed By: Mehta MD, Ritvik P (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Ex Parte Application to Stay All Proceedings Until April 1, 2021 When Counsel Returns From Maternity Leave and Cancel the Subpoena Issued to The California Medical Board) filed by Jimenez, Carlos F. Filed By: Jimenez, Carlos F (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 02/18/2021 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Mehta MD, Ritvik P; RITVIK P MEHTA MD APC; San Diego Surgical Corporation. Filed By: Mehta MD, Ritvik P (Cross - Defendant); RITVIK P MEHTA MD APC (Cross - Defendant); San Diego Surgical Corporation (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Mehta MD, Ritvik P. Filed By: Mehta MD, Ritvik P (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Cross-Complaint (FIRST) filed by Jimenez, Carlos F. Refers to: Mehta MD, Ritvik; RITVIK P MEHTA MD APC; San Diego Surgical Corporation Filed By: Jimenez, Carlos F (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Jimenez, Carlos F. Filed By: Jimenez, Carlos F (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (to show cause regarding preliminary injunction) submitted by Mehta MD, Ritvik P received but not filed on 07/21/2020. Filed By: Mehta MD, Ritvik P (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (of ex parte application, memorandum of points and authorities, declarations, proposed order) filed by Mehta MD, Ritvik P. Filed By: Mehta MD, Ritvik P (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Mehta MD, Ritvik P. Refers to: Jimenez, Carlos Filed By: Mehta MD, Ritvik P (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/02/2021 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mehta MD, Ritvik P. Refers to: Jimenez, Carlos Filed By: Mehta MD, Ritvik P (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mehta MD, Ritvik P. Refers to: Jimenez, Carlos Filed By: Mehta MD, Ritvik P (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Mehta MD, Ritvik P. Refers to: Jimenez, Carlos Filed By: Mehta MD, Ritvik P (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fraser, Esther