This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 08:15:19 (UTC).

Medellin vs Torres

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Medellin filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Torres. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Medellin, Edwin Josue

Pinuelas, Eugene Fernando

Defendant

Torres, Marcelino Alberto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beloryan, Haik

Defendant Attorney

Coderre, Matthew

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS D POKLADOWSKI & ASSOCI

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/08/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Medellin, Edwin Josue; Pinuelas, Eugene Fernando. Refers to: Torres, Marcelino

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Medellin, Edwin Josue; Pinuelas, Eugene Fernando. Refers to: Torres, Marcelino

Complaint

Complaint filed by Medellin, Edwin Josue; Pinuelas, Eugene Fernando. Refers to: Torres, Marcelino

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Medellin, Edwin Josue.

Application and Order Correcting Court Record

Application and Order Correcting Court Record filed by Torres, Marcelino Alberto.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Torres, Marcelino Alberto.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Torres, Marcelino Alberto. Filed By: Torres, Marcelino Alberto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Correcting Court Record filed by Torres, Marcelino Alberto. Filed By: Torres, Marcelino Alberto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Medellin, Edwin Josue. Filed By: Medellin, Edwin Josue (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Medellin, Edwin Josue; Pinuelas, Eugene Fernando. Refers to: Torres, Marcelino Filed By: Medellin, Edwin Josue (Plaintiff); Pinuelas, Eugene Fernando (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Medellin, Edwin Josue; Pinuelas, Eugene Fernando. Refers to: Torres, Marcelino Filed By: Medellin, Edwin Josue (Plaintiff); Pinuelas, Eugene Fernando (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Medellin, Edwin Josue; Pinuelas, Eugene Fernando. Refers to: Torres, Marcelino Filed By: Medellin, Edwin Josue (Plaintiff); Pinuelas, Eugene Fernando (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/08/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less