This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 10:39:14 (UTC).

MCS 555 West Beech LLC vs Bongiovanni

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 MCS 555 West Beech LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Bongiovanni. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCS 555 West Beech LLC

Defendants

Torres, Carlos

Frank Bongiovanni as Trustee of the Bongiovanni Living Trust AS AMENDED AND RESTATED IN 2009

Kathleen Anne Bongiovanni as Trustee of the Bongiovanni Living Trust AS AMENDED AND RESTATED IN 2009

Bongiovanni, Frank

Bongiovanni, Kathleen Anne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fontaine, Justin

Attorney at PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH LLP

525 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Reed, Rebecca L

525 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

LEEDS, PAUL J

Attorney at HIGGS FLETCHER & MACK LLP

401 W A Street 2600

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by MCS 555 West Beech LLC. Refers to: Bongiovanni, Frank; Bongiovanni, Kathleen; Frank Bongiovanni as Trustee of the Bongiovanni Living Trust AS AMENDED AND RESTATED IN 2009; Torres, Carlos

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by MCS 555 West Beech LLC. Refers to: Bongiovanni, Frank; Bongiovanni, Kathleen; Frank Bongiovanni as Trustee of the Bongiovanni Living Trust AS AMENDED AND RESTATED IN 2009; Torres, Carlos

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Bongiovanni, Frank.

Answer

Answer filed by Bongiovanni, Frank.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Frank Bongiovanni

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by MCS 555 West Beech LLC; MCS 555 West Beech LLC. Refers to: Bongiovanni, Frank

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt as Trustees

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by MCS 555 West Beech LLC; MCS 555 West Beech LLC. Refers to: Frank Bongiovanni as Trustee of the Bongiovanni Living Trust AS AMENDED AND RESTATED IN 2009; Kathleen Anne Bongiovanni as Trustee of the Bongiovanni Living Trust AS AMENDED AND RESTATED IN 2009

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt for Kathleen Bongiovanni

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by MCS 555 West Beech LLC. Refers to: Bongiovanni, Kathleen

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by MCS 555 West Beech LLC. Refers to: Torres, Carlos

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by MCS 555 West Beech LLC.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by MCS 555 West Beech LLC.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/16/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Bongiovanni, Frank .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Bongiovanni, Kathleen Anne .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Frank Bongiovanni as Trustee of the Bongiovanni Living Trust AS AMENDED AND RESTATED IN 2009.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Torres, Carlos .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Kathleen Anne Bongiovanni as Trustee of the Bongiovanni Living Trust AS AMENDED AND RESTATED IN 2009.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to MCS 555 West Beech LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by MCS 555 West Beech LLC. Filed By: MCS 555 West Beech LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by MCS 555 West Beech LLC. Filed By: MCS 555 West Beech LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by MCS 555 West Beech LLC. Refers to: Torres, Carlos Filed By: MCS 555 West Beech LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/16/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by MCS 555 West Beech LLC. Refers to: Bongiovanni, Frank; Bongiovanni, Kathleen; Frank Bongiovanni as Trustee of the Bongiovanni Living Trust AS AMENDED AND RESTATED IN 2009; Torres, Carlos; Kathleen Anne Bongiovanni as Trustee of the Bongiovanni Living Trust AS AMENDED AND RESTATED IN 2009 Filed By: MCS 555 West Beech LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by MCS 555 West Beech LLC. Refers to: Bongiovanni, Frank; Bongiovanni, Kathleen; Frank Bongiovanni as Trustee of the Bongiovanni Living Trust AS AMENDED AND RESTATED IN 2009; Torres, Carlos Filed By: MCS 555 West Beech LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by MCS 555 West Beech LLC. Refers to: Bongiovanni, Frank; Bongiovanni, Kathleen; Frank Bongiovanni as Trustee of the Bongiovanni Living Trust AS AMENDED AND RESTATED IN 2009; Torres, Carlos Filed By: MCS 555 West Beech LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEEDS PAUL JOHN