This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2020 at 00:31:13 (UTC).

McMillan VS Louis J Zizzo Trustee of the Mary A Zizzo Family Trust

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 McMillan filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Louis J Zizzo Trustee of the Mary A Zizzo Family Trust. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

McMillan, Frances ; FKA : Zizzo, Frances

Defendant

Louis J Zizzo Trustee of the Mary A Zizzo Family Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cate, Allan O

Defendant Attorney

MURPHY, JOHN J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN J MURPHY III

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by McMillan, Frances. Refers to: Louis J Zizzo Trustee of the Mary A Zizzo Family Trust

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by McMillan, Frances. Refers to: Louis J Zizzo Trustee of the Mary A Zizzo Family Trust

Complaint

Complaint filed by McMillan, Frances. Refers to: Louis J Zizzo Trustee of the Mary A Zizzo Family Trust

Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice of Pendency of Action filed by McMillan, Frances.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by McMillan, Frances.

Answer

Answer filed by Louis J Zizzo Trustee of the Mary A Zizzo Family Trust.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/09/2020 08:30:00 AM.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (of notice, motion, declaration, proposed order) filed by McMillan, Frances.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by McMillan, Frances received but not filed on 03/09/2020.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Frances McMillan) filed by McMillan, Frances.

Notice of Motion to Consolidate Cases

Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by McMillan, Frances.

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by McMillan, Frances.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by McMillan, Frances.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment (IN SUPPORT OF FRANCES MCMILLAN'S EX PARTE NOTICE) filed by McMillan, Frances.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 10/02/2020 at 10:45:00 AM in C-65 before Ronald F. Frazier at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by McMillan, Frances. Filed By: McMillan, Frances (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate Cases filed by McMillan, Frances. Filed By: McMillan, Frances (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Frances McMillan) filed by McMillan, Frances. Filed By: McMillan, Frances (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by McMillan, Frances received but not filed on 03/09/2020. Filed By: McMillan, Frances (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (of notice, motion, declaration, proposed order) filed by McMillan, Frances. Filed By: McMillan, Frances (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) set for 07/17/2020 at 8:30 am vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/09/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by McMillan, Frances. Filed By: McMillan, Frances (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Louis J Zizzo Trustee of the Mary A Zizzo Family Trust. Filed By: Louis J Zizzo Trustee of the Mary A Zizzo Family Trust (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by McMillan, Frances. Filed By: McMillan, Frances (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed by McMillan, Frances. Filed By: McMillan, Frances (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/29/2020 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by McMillan, Frances. Refers to: Louis J Zizzo Trustee of the Mary A Zizzo Family Trust Filed By: McMillan, Frances (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by McMillan, Frances. Refers to: Louis J Zizzo Trustee of the Mary A Zizzo Family Trust Filed By: McMillan, Frances (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by McMillan, Frances. Refers to: Louis J Zizzo Trustee of the Mary A Zizzo Family Trust Filed By: McMillan, Frances (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GABRIEL MONEER AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE MARY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cate, Allan