Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/17/2020 at 03:22:18 (UTC).

McKenzie vs Villamar

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 McKenzie filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Villamar. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

McKenzie, Richard J

McKenzie, Audree Lortie

McKenzie, Hugh Gaston

McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie

Defendants

Robled, Eduardo

Villamar, Erika G; AKA : Villamar, Erika Garcia

Robledo, Eduardo

Villamar, Erika G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

Ruiz, Jesse F

160 W Santa Clara Street 1000

San Jose, CA 95113

ZIMMERMAN, JON B

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by McKenzie, Audree Lortie; McKenzie, Hugh Gaston; McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie; McKenzie, Richard J.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/31/2020 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 07/31/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in C-66 before Kenneth J Medel at Central.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Robledo, Eduardo.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/15/2019 08:30:00 AM.

Proof of Service by Publication

Proof of Service by Publication filed by McKenzie, Richard J.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by McKenzie, Audree Lortie; McKenzie, Hugh Gaston; McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie; McKenzie, Richard J.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by McKenzie, Audree Lortie; McKenzie, Hugh Gaston; McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie; McKenzie, Richard J.

Order for Publication of Summons/Citation

Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by McKenzie, Audree Lortie; McKenzie, Hugh Gaston; McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie; McKenzie, Richard J.

Declaration - Other

[Another document for ROA# 22]

Declaration - Other

[Another document for ROA# 22]

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation

[Another document for ROA# 22]

Answer

Answer filed by Villamar, Erika G.

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem - ORDER UPDATED

[Another document for ROA# 3]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by McKenzie, Hugh Gaston; McKenzie, Richard J; McKenzie, Audree Lortie; McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie. Refers to: Villamar, Erika; Robled, Eduardo; McKenzie, Richard

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by McKenzie, Richard J; McKenzie, Audree Lortie; McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie; McKenzie, Hugh Gaston. Refers to: Villamar, Erika; Robled, Eduardo; McKenzie, Richard

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 10/02/2020 at 08:30AM before Judge Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/14/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/14/2020 at 08:30AM before Judge Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/31/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by McKenzie, Audree Lortie; McKenzie, Hugh Gaston; McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie; McKenzie, Richard J. Filed By: McKenzie, Audree Lortie (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Hugh Gaston (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Richard J (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by McKenzie, Audree Lortie; McKenzie, Hugh Gaston; McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie; McKenzie, Richard J. Filed By: McKenzie, Audree Lortie (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Hugh Gaston (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Richard J (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 07/31/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in C-66 before Kenneth J Medel at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by McKenzie, Audree Lortie; McKenzie, Hugh Gaston; McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie; McKenzie, Richard J. Filed By: McKenzie, Audree Lortie (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Hugh Gaston (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Richard J (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees (Granted in Whole) filed by Robledo, Eduardo. Filed By: Robledo, Eduardo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY JESSE F. RUIZ IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S EX PARTE HEARING) filed by McKenzie, Richard J; McKenzie, Audree Lortie; McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie; McKenzie, Richard J; McKenzie, Hugh Gaston. Filed By: McKenzie, Richard J (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Audree Lortie (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Richard J (Guardian Ad Litem); McKenzie, Hugh Gaston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 04/16/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by McKenzie, Richard J; McKenzie, Audree Lortie; McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie; McKenzie, Hugh Gaston. Refers to: Villamar, Erika; Robledo, Eduardo; McKenzie, Richard; Villamar, Erika Filed By: McKenzie, Richard J (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Audree Lortie (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Hugh Gaston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by McKenzie, Richard J; McKenzie, Audree Lortie; McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie; McKenzie, Hugh Gaston. Refers to: Villamar, Erika; Robledo, Eduardo; McKenzie, Richard Filed By: McKenzie, Richard J (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Audree Lortie (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Hugh Gaston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 3]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by McKenzie, Richard J; McKenzie, Audree Lortie; McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie; McKenzie, Hugh Gaston. Refers to: Villamar, Erika; Robledo, Eduardo; McKenzie, Richard Filed By: McKenzie, Richard J (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Audree Lortie (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Lucas David Lortie (Plaintiff); McKenzie, Hugh Gaston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/15/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUIZ JESSE FRANK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZIMMERMAN JON B.