This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 08:56:52 (UTC).

McElwaine-Leto vs Universal Recovery Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/03/2016 McElwaine-Leto filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Universal Recovery Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCELWAINE-LETO, GENEVA

Defendant

UNIVERSAL RECOVERY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCELWAINE-LETO, ALICIA

235 E Broadway

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant Attorney

GRIFFITH, AMANDA N

Attorney at ELLIS LAW GROUP LLP

1425 River Park Drive 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by UNIVERSAL RECOVERY CORPORATION. Refers to: McElwaine-Leto, Geneva

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/20/2017 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by UNIVERSAL RECOVERY CORPORATION.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by McElwaine-Leto, Geneva.

Complaint

Complaint filed by McElwaine-Leto, Geneva. Refers to: UNIVERSAL RECOVERY CORPORATION

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by McElwaine-Leto, Geneva.

Summons

Original Summons filed by McElwaine-Leto, Geneva.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2017
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 12/01/2017 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2017 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to McElwaine-Leto, Geneva .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to UNIVERSAL RECOVERY CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by McElwaine-Leto, Geneva. Filed By: McElwaine-Leto, Geneva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by UNIVERSAL RECOVERY CORPORATION. Filed By: UNIVERSAL RECOVERY CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/20/2017 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2017 at 08:30AM before Judge Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • This matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 12/01/2017 at 10:00AM before Judge Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Pursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 24 months.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by UNIVERSAL RECOVERY CORPORATION. Refers to: McElwaine-Leto, Geneva Filed By: UNIVERSAL RECOVERY CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/20/2017 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by McElwaine-Leto, Geneva. Filed By: McElwaine-Leto, Geneva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by McElwaine-Leto, Geneva. Filed By: McElwaine-Leto, Geneva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by McElwaine-Leto, Geneva. Refers to: UNIVERSAL RECOVERY CORPORATION Filed By: McElwaine-Leto, Geneva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Recovery, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Griffith, Amanda N