This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/15/2020 at 09:25:15 (UTC).

McDonald vs Bennett

Case Summary

On 05/14/2015 McDonald filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bennett. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EARL H. MAAS, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EARL H. MAAS, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

McDonald, Howard

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Bennett, Michael

Bennett, Victoria

Francis, Adam

Property Advantage Inc

Property Advantage Carlsbad, Inc.

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

McDonald, Howard

Francis, Adam

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Baker, Jason E; JEX, BRENT

6255 Lusk Boulevard

San Diego, CA 92121

BAKER, JASON E

6255 Lusk Blvd

San Diego, CA 92121

JEX, BRENT

6255 Lusk Blvd

San Diego, CA 92121

SINGLETON, TERRY

Attorney at TERRY SINGLETON APC

1950 Fifth Avenue 200

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KLEIN, MICHAEL L

Attorney at GREENMAN LACY KLEIN O HARRA & HEFFRON

P O Box 299

Oceanside, CA 92049

GUY, DOUGLAS D

Attorney at GATES GONTER GUY PROUDFOOT & MUENCH LLP

15373 Innovation Drive 170

San Diego, CA 92128

KONOSKE, GREGORY P

Attorney at KONOSKE AKIYAMA & BRUST LLP

16880 W Bernardo Drive 250

San Diego, CA 92127

WOOD, KAREN D

Attorney at BONNIE R MOSS & ASSOCIATES

8989 Rio San Diego Drive 325

San Diego, CA 92108

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BAKER, JASON E

6255 Lusk Blvd

San Diego, CA 92121

JEX, BRENT

6255 Lusk Blvd

San Diego, CA 92121

SINGLETON, TERRY

Attorney at TERRY SINGLETON APC

1950 Fifth Avenue 200

San Diego, CA 92101

KLEIN, MICHAEL L

Attorney at GREENMAN LACY KLEIN O HARRA & HEFFRON

P O Box 299

Oceanside, CA 92049

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Francis, Adam.

Plaintiff's Status Conference Statement

Statement - Other (PLAINTIFFS STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT) filed by McDonald, Howard.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (OF CONTINUED HEARING) filed by Property Advantage Carlsbad, Inc.; Property Advantage Inc.

Statement of Undisputed Facts

Statement of Undisputed Facts (10/21/16) filed by McDonald, Howard.

Response

Response (10/21 PLTF SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOS TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT) filed by Property Advantage Carlsbad, Inc.; Property Advantage Inc.

Reply

Reply (10/26 SUMMARY JUDGMENT) filed by Bennett, Michael; Bennett, Victoria.

Objections

Objections (10/21 SUMMARY JUDGMENT) filed by Bennett, Michael; Bennett, Victoria.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/21/2016 01:30:00 PM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 12/09/2016 01:30:00 PM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/19/2017 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Motion in Limine (3 of 11)

Motion in Limine filed by McDonald, Howard.

Notice of Motion in Limine (11 of 11)

Motion in Limine filed by McDonald, Howard.

Notice of Motion in Limine (2 of 11)

Motion in Limine filed by McDonald, Howard.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by McDonald, Howard.

Trial Brief

Trial Brief filed by McDonald, Howard.

Declaration of Jason E. Baker

Declaration - Other filed by McDonald, Howard.

Answer

Answer filed by Francis, Adam.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Property Advantage Inc.

172 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/13/2020 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (3/13 NOTICE OF HEARING AND AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER) filed by Francis, Adam. Filed By: Francis, Adam (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2020 at 09:15AM before Judge Earl H. Maas, III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/25/2020 at 09:15AM before Judge Earl H. Maas, III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/14/2020 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement - Other (PLAINTIFFS STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT) filed by McDonald, Howard. Filed By: McDonald, Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by McDonald, Howard. Filed By: McDonald, Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/13/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
223 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Bennett, Michael; Bennett, Victoria; Property Advantage Inc. Filed By: Bennett, Michael (Defendant); Bennett, Victoria (Defendant); Property Advantage Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisclosure of Relationship filed by Bennett, Michael; Bennett, Victoria; Property Advantage Inc. Filed By: Bennett, Michael (Defendant); Bennett, Victoria (Defendant); Property Advantage Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 1) filed by McDonald, Howard. Refers to: Property Advantage Carlsbad, Inc. Filed By: McDonald, Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/11/2015 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by McDonald, Howard. Refers to: Bennett, Michael; Bennett, Victoria; Property Advantage Inc; Francis, Adam; Property Advantage Carlsbad, Inc. Filed By: McDonald, Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by McDonald, Howard. Refers to: Bennett, Michael; Bennett, Victoria; Property Advantage Inc; Francis, Adam Filed By: McDonald, Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by McDonald, Howard. Refers to: Bennett, Michael; Bennett, Victoria; Property Advantage Inc; Francis, Adam Filed By: McDonald, Howard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.