This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 02:27:50 (UTC).

McCullough Plumbing Inc vs Consolidated Contracting Services Inc

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 McCullough Plumbing Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Consolidated Contracting Services Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

McCullough Plumbing Inc

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Consolidated Contracting Services Inc

JSW Chula Country Club LP

Comunidad De Salud De La San Ysidro Inc; DBA : San Ysidro Health Center

San Ysidro Health Center; DBA : San Ysidro Health Center

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

McCullough Plumbing Inc

Consolidated Contracting Services Inc

Design West Engineering, Inc.

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Federated Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Cauley, Kevin T

Attorney at SCHWARTZ SEMERDJIAN CAULEY & EVANS LLP

101 West Broadway Suite 810

San Diego, CA 92101

Siegel, Mark S

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MARK S SIEGEL

401 West A Street Suite 1730

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Braasch, Debra L

Attorney at MACDONALD & CODY LLP

28 Executive Park, Third Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Hirst, Paul C

Attorney at MCLEOD LAW GROUP APC

1155 Camino Del Mar Suite 510

Del Mar, CA 92014

Grebing, Stephen C

Attorney at WINGERT GREBING BRUBAKER & JUSKIE LLP

600 W Broadway 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

AGUILERA, A ERIC

Attorney at THE AGUILERA LAW GROUP APLC

23046 Avenida De La Carlota 300

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Cauley, Kevin T

Attorney at SCHWARTZ SEMERDJIAN CAULEY & EVANS LLP

101 West Broadway Suite 810

San Diego, CA 92101

Siegel, Mark S

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MARK S SIEGEL

401 West A Street Suite 1730

San Diego, CA 92101

Braasch, Debra L

Attorney at MACDONALD & CODY LLP

28 Executive Park, Third Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Hirst, Paul C

Attorney at MCLEOD LAW GROUP APC

1155 Camino Del Mar Suite 510

Del Mar, CA 92014

BOYER, BRADLEY P

Attorney at KUTAKROCK LI P

777 Tower, 777 S Figueroa St #4550

Los Angeles, CA 90017

AGUILERA, A ERIC

Attorney at THE AGUILERA LAW GROUP APLC

23046 Avenida De La Carlota 300

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

WEISS, BRYAN M

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery St 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Cross-Defendant Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Answer filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.

Summons re Cross-Complaint

Original Summons (Cross Complaint) filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Refers to: McCullough Plumbing Inc; Federated Mutual Insurance Company

Cross-Complaint of Travelers

Cross-Complaint filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Refers to: Federated Mutual Insurance Company; McCullough Plumbing Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Refers to: Federated Mutual Insurance Company

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by McCullough Plumbing Inc. Refers to: JSW Chula Country Club LP

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Design West Engineering, Inc..

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Comunidad De Salud De La San Ysidro Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Comunidad De Salud De La San Ysidro Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Comunidad De Salud De La San Ysidro Inc.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Design West Engineering, Inc..

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Design West Engineering, Inc..

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.

Case Management Order (Order)

Case Management Statement filed by Consolidated Contracting Services Inc.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Consolidated Contracting Services Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by McCullough Plumbing Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by McCullough Plumbing Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by McCullough Plumbing Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/22/2021 10:15:00 AM.

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 04/22/2022 at 10:15AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/10/2021 10:15:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Design West Engineering, Inc.. Filed By: Design West Engineering, Inc. (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Consolidated Contracting Services Inc. Filed By: Consolidated Contracting Services Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by San Ysidro Health Center. Filed By: San Ysidro Health Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by San Ysidro Health Center. Filed By: San Ysidro Health Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Filed By: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Consolidated Contracting Services Inc. Filed By: Consolidated Contracting Services Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed by McCullough Plumbing Inc. Filed By: McCullough Plumbing Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by McCullough Plumbing Inc. Refers to: Consolidated Contracting Services Inc Filed By: McCullough Plumbing Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by McCullough Plumbing Inc. Refers to: Comunidad De Salud De La San Ysidro Inc Filed By: McCullough Plumbing Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/23/2021 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by McCullough Plumbing Inc. Refers to: Consolidated Contracting Services Inc; JSW Chula Country Club LP; Comunidad De Salud De La San Ysidro Inc Filed By: McCullough Plumbing Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by McCullough Plumbing Inc. Refers to: Consolidated Contracting Services Inc; JSW Chula Country Club LP; Comunidad De Salud De La San Ysidro Inc Filed By: McCullough Plumbing Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by McCullough Plumbing Inc. Refers to: Consolidated Contracting Services Inc; JSW Chula Country Club LP; Comunidad De Salud De La San Ysidro Inc Filed By: McCullough Plumbing Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less