This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/22/2018 at 09:28:21 (UTC).

McClamma vs. Styc

Case Summary

On 09/30/2011 McClamma filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Styc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

MCCLAMMA, T EDWARD

Defendants

RICHARD MARSHALL FINE FLOORING INC

SAN DIEGO SHOWERPAN

LOPEZ, SERGIO VARGAS

LOPEZ, ADRIAN

GASTELBAUM, MARCO

MCBREARTY, KEVIN JAMES; DBA : THE DOOR GUYS

LIRA-GARCIA, FREDDY JAVIER; DBA : LIRA'S PLUMBING

SORIA, JAIME ; DBA : NEW WAVE HARDWOOD FLOORS

GRAY, GREGORY LEE; DBA : POOL 1

IRON WELDING INTERNATIONAL

LOTZ INC; DBA : NPL MECHANICAL

KIM, JIN KEUN; DBA : KAS HOME IMPROVEMENT CO

PATINO, MARTIN

HYDRO-TECH SPECIALTIES INC

MONTANO, JESUS ; DBA : J M FLOORING

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Cross Plaintiff

STYC, ATOOSA VANESSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

FINCH, P RANDOLPH JR

Attorney at FINCH THORNTON & BAIRD LLP

Executive Dr

San Diego, CA 92121

SALAZAR, MARGARITA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARGARITA SALAZAR

333 H Street Ste 5000

Chula Vista, CA 91910

MCDONNELL, MICHAEL B

Attorney at NOVARE LAW GROUP

2040 Harbor Island Drive 202

San Diego, CA 92101

HELLENKAMP, MARK E

101 W Broadway 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

MCDONALD, SARAH A

Attorney at MORRIS POLICH & PURDY LLP

500 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

STROJ, ROBERT J

Attorney at LANAK & HANNA PC

120 N Tustin Ave

Tustin, CA 92780

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MCLAUGHLIN, JAMES O

Attorney at KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

7676 Hazard Center Drive 900

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 07/18/17 - volume 2 of 3

Case File Contents as of 07/18/17 - volume 2 of 3

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/23/2013 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute submitted by McClamma, T Edward rejected on 06/20/2012.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Certificate of Progress Hearing heard 07/13/2012 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Certificate of Progress Hearing heard 07/27/2012 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Proof of Service by Publication

Proof of Service by Publication (Jesus Montano, San Diego Showerpan, Gregory Lee Gray, Marco Gastelbaum) filed by McClamma, T Edward. Refers to: Montano, Jesus; San Diego Showerpan; Gray, Gregory; Gastelbaum, Marco

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Meyer, John S. to Ronald Styn effective 09/19/2012

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 11/02/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Fee Waiver Hearing (Civil) heard 11/13/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/01/2013 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 09/20/2013 at 09:30:00 AM in C-62 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 09/27/2013 at 09:30:00 AM in C-62 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/26/2013 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Leon, Jose De Jesus, on 07/12/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Leon, Jose De Jesus, on 07/12/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Leon, Jose De Jesus, on 07/12/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Lopez, Sergio Vargas, on 07/19/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Leon, Jose De Jesus, on 07/12/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Leon, Jose De Jesus, on 07/12/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Leon, Jose De Jesus, on 07/12/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Lopez, Sergio Vargas, on 07/12/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Soria, Jaime, on 11/16/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Lopez, Adrian, on 10/31/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
355 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2011
  • General Denial filed by Styc, Atoosa Vanessa; Styc, Homa. Filed By: Styc, Atoosa Vanessa (Defendant); Styc, Homa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by McClamma, T Edward. Refers to: Styc, Atoosa Filed By: McClamma, T Edward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by McClamma, T Edward. Refers to: Styc, Homa Filed By: McClamma, T Edward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • Certificate of Service filed by McClamma, T Edward. Filed By: McClamma, T Edward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by McClamma, T Edward. Refers to: Styc, Atoosa; Styc, Homa Filed By: McClamma, T Edward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • Original Summons filed by McClamma, T Edward. Refers to: Styc, Atoosa; Styc, Homa Filed By: McClamma, T Edward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • Complaint filed by McClamma, T Edward. Refers to: Styc, Atoosa; Styc, Homa; Leon, Jose Filed By: McClamma, T Edward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.