This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/11/2020 at 09:40:51 (UTC).

McCannon vs Kempa

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 McCannon filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kempa. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

McCannon, Ellen

Defendant

Kempa, Melinda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Landay, John K

Attorney at LANDAY ROBERTS LLP

Defendant Attorney

Luebke, Anthony

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DARLENE ROHR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 04/23/2021 at 08:55:00 AM in C-75 before Richard E. L. Strauss at Central.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 05/07/2021 at 08:50:00 AM in C-75 before Richard E. L. Strauss at Central.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/28/2020 10:45:00 AM.

Mediator Selection Form

Mediator Selection Form filed by Kempa, Melinda.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by McCannon, Ellen.

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by McCannon, Ellen.

Plaintiff's Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by McCannon, Ellen.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/24/2020 10:45:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 01/24/2020 at 10:45:00 AM in C-75 before Richard E. L. Strauss at Central.

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Kempa, Melinda.

Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Kempa, Melinda.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by McCannon, Ellen. Refers to: Kempa, Melinda

Answer

Answer filed by Kempa, Melinda.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Kempa, Melinda.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Kempa, Melinda.

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by McCannon, Ellen. Refers to: Kempa, Melinda

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by McCannon, Ellen. Refers to: Kempa, Melinda

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 04/23/2021 at 08:55:00 AM in C-75 before Richard E. L. Strauss at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial rescheduled to 05/07/2021 at 08:50:00 AM in C-75 before Richard E. L. Strauss at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediator Selection Form filed by Kempa, Melinda. Filed By: Kempa, Melinda (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 24 months.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 10/23/2020 at 08:55AM before Judge Richard E. L. Strauss.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 11/06/2020 at 08:50AM before Judge Richard E. L. Strauss.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketJury demanded by all parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketThis matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Kempa, Melinda. Filed By: Kempa, Melinda (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Kempa, Melinda. Filed By: Kempa, Melinda (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by McCannon, Ellen. Refers to: Kempa, Melinda Filed By: McCannon, Ellen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by McCannon, Ellen. Refers to: Kempa, Melinda Filed By: McCannon, Ellen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by McCannon, Ellen. Refers to: Kempa, Melinda Filed By: McCannon, Ellen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by McCannon, Ellen. Refers to: Kempa, Melinda Filed By: McCannon, Ellen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less