This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/14/2022 at 22:34:10 (UTC).

Mayo vs FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Mayo filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mayo, Liliana V

Mayo, Shayne A

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daghighian, Sepehr

Attorney at CALIFORNIA CONSUMER ATTORNEYS PC

10866 Wilshire Boulevard 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Oppenheim, Michael William

Attorney at CALIFORNIA CONSUMER ATTORNEYS P C

10866 Wilshire Boulevard 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Rosenstein, Michael H

Attorney at CALIFORNIA CONSUMER ATTORNEYS P C

10866 Wilshire Boulevard 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorney

Skanes, Mark

4100 W Alameda Avenue 300

Burbank, CA 91505

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Mayo, Liliana V; Mayo, Shayne A. Refers to: FCA US LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mayo, Liliana V; Mayo, Shayne A. Refers to: FCA US LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Mayo, Liliana V; Mayo, Shayne A. Refers to: FCA US LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mayo, Liliana V; Mayo, Shayne A. Refers to: FCA US LLC

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by FCA US LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by FCA US LLC.; Filed By: FCA US LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mayo, Liliana V; Mayo, Shayne A. Refers to: FCA US LLC; Filed By: Mayo, Liliana V (Plaintiff); Mayo, Shayne A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Mayo, Liliana V; Mayo, Shayne A. Refers to: FCA US LLC; Filed By: Mayo, Liliana V (Plaintiff); Mayo, Shayne A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mayo, Liliana V; Mayo, Shayne A. Refers to: FCA US LLC; Filed By: Mayo, Liliana V (Plaintiff); Mayo, Shayne A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mayo, Liliana V; Mayo, Shayne A. Refers to: FCA US LLC; Filed By: Mayo, Liliana V (Plaintiff); Mayo, Shayne A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OPPENHEIM MICHAEL WILLIAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAGHIGHIAN, SEPEHR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENSTEIN MICHAEL HARRIS