This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 05:18:59 (UTC).

Maximum Vapor Inc vs Nude Nicotine Inc

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 Maximum Vapor Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nude Nicotine Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Randa Trapp and Timothy Taylor. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Randa Trapp

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maximum Vapor Inc

Defendant

Nude Nicotine Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miller, Adam I

Defendant Attorney

PARCELLS III, DAYTON B

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Maximum Vapor Inc.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Maximum Vapor Inc.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Nude Nicotine Inc.

Amended Answer

Amended Answer (1st) filed by Nude Nicotine Inc.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Second Cause of Action for Fraud

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions (NOT ENTERED) filed by Maximum Vapor Inc.

Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - Other (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) filed by Maximum Vapor Inc.

Notice of Case Reassignment

Notice - Other (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT) filed by Maximum Vapor Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Maximum Vapor Inc. Refers to: Nude Nicotine Inc

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Trapp, Randa to Timothy Taylor effective 06/09/2020

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Maximum Vapor Inc.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/19/2021 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Maximum Vapor Inc. Refers to: Nude Nicotine Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Maximum Vapor Inc. Refers to: Nude Nicotine Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Maximum Vapor Inc. Refers to: Nude Nicotine Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/19/2021 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Nude Nicotine Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Maximum Vapor Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Maximum Vapor Inc. Filed By: Maximum Vapor Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Maximum Vapor Inc. Filed By: Maximum Vapor Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions (NOT ENTERED) filed by Maximum Vapor Inc. Filed By: Maximum Vapor Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Nude Nicotine Inc. Filed By: Nude Nicotine Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer (1st) filed by Nude Nicotine Inc. Filed By: Nude Nicotine Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) filed by Maximum Vapor Inc. Filed By: Maximum Vapor Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT) filed by Maximum Vapor Inc. Filed By: Maximum Vapor Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/19/2021 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/05/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Maximum Vapor Inc. Filed By: Maximum Vapor Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/05/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Maximum Vapor Inc. Refers to: Nude Nicotine Inc Filed By: Maximum Vapor Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Maximum Vapor Inc. Refers to: Nude Nicotine Inc Filed By: Maximum Vapor Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Maximum Vapor Inc. Refers to: Nude Nicotine Inc Filed By: Maximum Vapor Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARCELLS DAYTON B. III