This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/20/2023 at 08:18:46 (UTC).

Mason VS Ariana Kabob House

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 Mason filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Ariana Kabob House. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mason, Roy

Defendants

Ariana Kabob House

Maher, Nadia

Maher, Wahid

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shin, Ted S

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Mason, Roy. Refers to: Ariana Kabob House; Maher, Nadia; Maher, Wahid

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mason, Roy. Refers to: Ariana Kabob House; Maher, Nadia; Maher, Wahid

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Mason, Roy. Refers to: Ariana Kabob House; Maher, Nadia; Maher, Wahid

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Mason, Roy.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Mason, Roy.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Mason, Roy.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2023
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Mason, Roy, on 12/21/2022, has expired.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Mason, Roy.; Filed By: Mason, Roy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Mason, Roy.; Filed By: Mason, Roy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Mason, Roy .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Ariana Kabob House.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Maher, Wahid .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Maher, Nadia .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Mason, Roy.; Filed By: Mason, Roy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Braner, Matthew.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Mason, Roy.; Filed By: Mason, Roy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Mason, Roy. Refers to: Ariana Kabob House; Maher, Nadia; Maher, Wahid; Filed By: Mason, Roy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mason, Roy. Refers to: Ariana Kabob House; Maher, Nadia; Maher, Wahid; Filed By: Mason, Roy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Mason, Roy. Refers to: Ariana Kabob House; Maher, Nadia; Maher, Wahid; Filed By: Mason, Roy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less