This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/07/2023 at 07:08:39 (UTC).

Mason vs Achilles Coffee Roasters

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 Mason filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Achilles Coffee Roasters. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mason, Roy

Defendants

Achilles Coffee Roasters

Blue WP San Diego LLC

Zen Deb Web Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shin, Ted S

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF TED S SHIN

9984 Scripps Ranch Boulevard 311

San Diego, CA 92131

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Mason, Roy. Refers to: Achilles Coffee Roasters; Zen Deb Web Services Inc; Blue WP San Diego LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mason, Roy. Refers to: Achilles Coffee Roasters; Zen Deb Web Services Inc; Blue WP San Diego LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Mason, Roy. Refers to: Achilles Coffee Roasters; Zen Deb Web Services Inc; Blue WP San Diego LLC

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Mason, Roy.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Cause of Actions

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Mason, Roy.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Mason, Roy .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Blue WP San Diego LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Zen Deb Web Services Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Achilles Coffee Roasters.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Mason, Roy.; Filed By: Mason, Roy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Mason, Roy.; Filed By: Mason, Roy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Mason, Roy.; Filed By: Mason, Roy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Mason, Roy. Refers to: Achilles Coffee Roasters; Zen Deb Web Services Inc; Blue WP San Diego LLC; Filed By: Mason, Roy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mason, Roy. Refers to: Achilles Coffee Roasters; Zen Deb Web Services Inc; Blue WP San Diego LLC; Filed By: Mason, Roy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Mason, Roy. Refers to: Achilles Coffee Roasters; Zen Deb Web Services Inc; Blue WP San Diego LLC; Filed By: Mason, Roy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less