This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/05/2021 at 07:03:01 (UTC).

Martinez vs Bodega Latina Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Martinez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bodega Latina Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martinez, Maria del Consuelo

Defendant

Bodega Latina Corporation; DBA : El Super

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Monguia, Manuel J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MONGUIA & MONGUIA

Defendant Attorney

Gravdal, Brian T

Attorney at SCHNEIDER & LOWARY LLP

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Martinez, Maria del Consuelo.

Answer

Answer filed by Bodega Latina Corporation.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Bodega Latina Corporation.

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[A document for ROA# 2]

Summons

Original Summons filed by Martinez, Maria del Consuelo. Refers to: Bodega Latina Corporation

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Martinez, Maria del Consuelo.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Bodega Latina Corporation. Filed By: Bodega Latina Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Bodega Latina Corporation. Filed By: Bodega Latina Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Martinez, Maria del Consuelo. Filed By: Martinez, Maria del Consuelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Martinez, Maria del Consuelo. Refers to: Bodega Latina Corporation Filed By: Martinez, Maria del Consuelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Martinez, Maria del Consuelo. Refers to: Bodega Latina Corporation Filed By: Martinez, Maria del Consuelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Martinez, Maria del Consuelo. Refers to: Bodega Latina Corporation Filed By: Martinez, Maria del Consuelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Martinez, Maria del Consuelo. Filed By: Martinez, Maria del Consuelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Martinez, Maria del Consuelo. Filed By: Martinez, Maria del Consuelo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bowman, Blaine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BODEGA LATINA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monguia, Manuel J