This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/13/2020 at 13:43:46 (UTC).

Martinez Sr vs Lindsay Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/20/2019 Martinez Sr filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Lindsay Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased

Martinez Sr, Sergio

Martinez, Nidia

Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased

Martinez Jr, Sergio Antonio

Defendants

Lindsay Corporation

Barrier Systems

Ferreira Construction Inc

Lindsay Transportation Solutions Sales & Service LLC

Coffman Specialities Inc

VALMONT INDUSTRIES INC

Lindsay Transportation Solutions LLC

Lindsay Transportation Solutions LLC; FKA : Lindsay Transportation Solutions Sales & Service LLC

VALMONT HIGHWAY DISTRIBUTION UNLIMITED; ESA : VALMONT HIGHWAY

State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSE, DANIEL S

Johnson, Glenn

Cervino, Gina

Defendant Attorneys

Nager, Jordan T

Attorney at LINCOLN GUSTAFSON & CERCOS LLP

Skinner, Heidi A

Attorney at STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPT OF TRANSPORTATION

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (REQ A VACATED MOTION HRG RE PRO HAC VICE) filed by Lindsay Corporation.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/04/2020 08:45:00 AM.

Association of Attorney

Association of Attorney filed by Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Nidia; Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr; Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Sergio Sr.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Nidia; Martinez, Sergio Sr; Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr; Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased. Refers to: Coffman Specialities Inc

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Nidia; Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr; Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Sergio Sr.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Nidia; Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr; Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Sergio Sr.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Nidia; Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr; Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Sergio Sr.

Notice of Hearing SD

Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/20/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney was vacated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/20/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney was vacated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/20/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney was vacated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/20/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney was vacated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 09/04/2020 at 09:30:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

LINDSAY CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer filed by Lindsay Corporation.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Lindsay Corporation.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by State of California.

DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer filed by State of California.

DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIAS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Demand for Jury Trial filed by The State of California.

DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIAS NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by The State of California.

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Nidia; Martinez, Sergio Sr; Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr; Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased. Refers to: Coffman Specialities Inc Filed By: Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased (Plaintiff); Martinez, Nidia (Plaintiff); Martinez, Sergio Sr (Plaintiff); Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr (Plaintiff); Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney filed by Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Nidia; Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr; Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Sergio Sr. Filed By: Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased (Plaintiff); Martinez, Nidia (Plaintiff); Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr (Plaintiff); Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased (Plaintiff); Martinez, Sergio Sr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/04/2020 08:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (REQ A VACATED MOTION HRG RE PRO HAC VICE) filed by Lindsay Corporation. Filed By: Lindsay Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 08/04/2020 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Lindsay Corporation. Filed By: Lindsay Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Lindsay Corporation. Filed By: Lindsay Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by State of California. Filed By: State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Nidia; Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr; Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Sergio Sr. Filed By: Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased (Plaintiff); Martinez, Nidia (Plaintiff); Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr (Plaintiff); Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased (Plaintiff); Martinez, Sergio Sr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Nidia; Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr; Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Martinez, Sergio Sr. Refers to: Lindsay Corporation; Barrier Systems; California Department of Transportation (CALTRANS); Coffman Specialities Inc; Ferreira Construction Inc; Lindsay Transportation Solutions Sales & Service LLC; State of California Filed By: Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased (Plaintiff); Martinez, Nidia (Plaintiff); Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr (Plaintiff); Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased (Plaintiff); Martinez, Sergio Sr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Martinez, Sergio Sr; Martinez, Nidia; Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr; Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased; Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased. Refers to: Lindsay Corporation; Lindsay Transportation Solutions Sales & Service LLC; Coffman Specialities Inc; Ferreira Construction Inc; Barrier Systems; State of California; California Department of Transportation (CALTRANS) Filed By: Martinez, Sergio Sr (Plaintiff); Martinez, Nidia (Plaintiff); Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr (Plaintiff); Nadia Martinez as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased (Plaintiff); Sergio Martinez Sr as a personal representative of the Estate of Gonzalo Trinidad Martinez Deceased (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Martinez, Sergio Sr; Martinez, Nidia; Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr. Refers to: Lindsay Corporation; Lindsay Transportation Solutions Sales & Service LLC; Coffman Specialities Inc; Ferreira Construction Inc; Barrier Systems; State of California; California Department of Transportation (CALTRANS) Filed By: Martinez, Sergio Sr (Plaintiff); Martinez, Nidia (Plaintiff); Martinez, Sergio Antonio Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barrier1 Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where COFFMAN SPECIALTIES, INC . is a litigant

Latest cases where LINDSAY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where VALMONT INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant