This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 20:39:03 (UTC).

Martinez Kelley vs. Jesus Lao MD

Case Summary

On 03/01/2018 Martinez Kelley filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Jesus Lao MD. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDA TRAPP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDA TRAPP

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KELLEY, OMAR

KELLEY, NICKEYALA

KELLEY, MARTINEZ

KELLEY JR, MARTINEZ

ROGERS, ALONZO

MARTINEZ KELLEY AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO CAROLYN KELLEY

ROGERS, JAMAR

KELLEY, MARQUES

ROGERS, FUHYDA

Defendants

JESUS LAO MD INC

LAO MD, JESUS

SYNOVATION MEDICAL GROUP INC

SYNOVATION MEDICAL GROUP

ALGOS INC; DBA : SYNOVATION MEDICAL GROUP;ESA : SYNOVATION MEDICAL GROUP;ESA : SYNOVATION MEDICAL GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINKELSTEIN, NORMAN M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF NORMAN M FINKELSTEIN APC

110 Juniper St

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

SCHAFER, TERRENCE J

5440 Trabuco Rd

Irvine, CA 92620

MCCABE, HUGH A

Attorney at NEIL DYMOTT FRANK MCFALL TREXLER MCCABE & HUD

110 Plaza, 110 W A St

San Diego, CA 92101-4959

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 09/20/2019 at 08:45:00 AM in C-70 before Randa Trapp at Central.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 09/06/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in C-70 before Randa Trapp at Central.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Algos Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Kelley, Martinez.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/26/2018 10:20:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

ALGOS INC DBA SYNOVATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED AND COMPLETE RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET 3)

Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Algos Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Algos Inc.

ALGOS INC DBA SYNOVATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED AND COMPLETE RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET 3)

[Another document for ROA# 41]

Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Complete Responses to Special Interrogatories

[Another document for ROA# 41]

Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Algos Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Jesus Lao MD) filed by Martinez Kelley as Successor in Interest to Carolyn Kelley. Refers to: Lao MD, Jesus

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Synovation Medical Group) filed by Martinez Kelley as Successor in Interest to Carolyn Kelley. Refers to: Algos Inc

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Algos Inc.

Answer

Answer filed by Lao MD, Jesus; Jesus Lao MD Inc.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Trial Counsel on behalf of Defendants Jesus Lao MD and Jesus Lao MD Inc) filed by Lao MD, Jesus; Jesus Lao MD Inc.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Kelley, Martinez; Martinez Kelley as Successor in Interest to Carolyn Kelley; Rogers, Fuhyda; Rogers, Alonzo; Rogers, Jamar; Kelley, Nickeyala; Kelley, Martinez Jr; Kelley, Marques; Kelley, Omar. Refers to: Lao MD, Jesus; Jesus Lao MD Inc; Synovation Medical Group; Synovation Medical Group Inc

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/06/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 09/06/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in C-70 before Randa Trapp at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 09/20/2019 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 09/20/2019 at 08:45:00 AM in C-70 before Randa Trapp at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation to Continue Trial and Related Dates)(ORDER SIGNED 08/06/19) filed by Kelley, Martinez. Filed By: Kelley, Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation to Continue Trial)(ORDER SIGNED 3/11/19) filed by Lao MD, Jesus. Filed By: Lao MD, Jesus (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/09/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 08/09/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in C-70 before Randa Trapp at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2019 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 08/23/2019 at 08:45:00 AM in C-70 before Randa Trapp at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2018
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 07/06/2018 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail filed by Algos Inc; Synovation Medical Group Inc. Filed By: Algos Inc (Defendant); Synovation Medical Group Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Algos Inc. Filed By: Algos Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/26/2018 at 10:20:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Kelley, Martinez; Martinez Kelley as Successor in Interest to Carolyn Kelley; Rogers, Fuhyda; Rogers, Alonzo; Rogers, Jamar; Kelley, Nickeyala; Kelley, Martinez Jr; Kelley, Marques; Kelley, Omar. Refers to: Lao MD, Jesus; Jesus Lao MD Inc; Algos Inc; Synovation Medical Group Inc Filed By: Kelley, Martinez (Plaintiff); Martinez Kelley as Successor in Interest to Carolyn Kelley (Plaintiff); Rogers, Fuhyda (Plaintiff); Rogers, Alonzo (Plaintiff); Rogers, Jamar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kelley, Martinez; Martinez Kelley as Successor in Interest to Carolyn Kelley; Rogers, Fuhyda; Rogers, Alonzo; Rogers, Jamar; Kelley, Nickeyala; Kelley, Martinez Jr; Kelley, Marques; Kelley, Omar. Refers to: Lao MD, Jesus; Jesus Lao MD Inc; Algos Inc; Synovation Medical Group Inc Filed By: Kelley, Martinez (Plaintiff); Martinez Kelley as Successor in Interest to Carolyn Kelley (Plaintiff); Rogers, Fuhyda (Plaintiff); Rogers, Alonzo (Plaintiff); Rogers, Jamar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Kelley, Martinez; Martinez Kelley as Successor in Interest to Carolyn Kelley; Rogers, Fuhyda; Rogers, Alonzo; Rogers, Jamar; Kelley, Nickeyala; Kelley, Martinez Jr; Kelley, Marques; Kelley, Omar. Refers to: Lao MD, Jesus; Jesus Lao MD Inc; Algos Inc Filed By: Kelley, Martinez (Plaintiff); Martinez Kelley as Successor in Interest to Carolyn Kelley (Plaintiff); Rogers, Fuhyda (Plaintiff); Rogers, Alonzo (Plaintiff); Rogers, Jamar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SYNOVATION MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where ALGOS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Finkelstein, Norman M