This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/28/2022 at 08:28:17 (UTC).

Martin vs Alcala Labs Inc

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 Martin filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Alcala Labs Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martin, Dominick

Defendant

Alcala Labs Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ferrell, Scott J

4100 Newport Place Drive Ste 800

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

Rifat, Matthew D

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MATTHEW D RIFAT APC

P O Box 19879

San Diego, CA 92159

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Martin, Dominick. Refers to: Alcala Labs Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Martin, Dominick. Refers to: Alcala Labs Inc

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Martin, Dominick. Refers to: Alcala Labs Inc

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Proof of Service

[Another document for ROA# 12]

Def's Notice of Removal to Federal Court

[Another document for ROA# 12]

Declaration of Matthew D. Rifat ISO Def's Notice of Removal

[Another document for ROA# 12]

Def.'s Notice of Party with Financial Interest

[Another document for ROA# 12]

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Alcala Labs Inc.

Def.'s Notice of Party with Financial Interest

Notice - Other (of party with financial interest) filed by Alcala Labs Inc.

Declaration of Matthew D. Rifat ISO Def's Notice of Removal

Declaration - Other (of M. Rifat in support of defendants notice of removal) filed by Alcala Labs Inc.

Def's Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Alcala Labs Inc.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 12]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 12]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 12]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 12]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Alcala Labs Inc.; Filed By: Alcala Labs Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (of party with financial interest) filed by Alcala Labs Inc.; Filed By: Alcala Labs Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of M. Rifat in support of defendants notice of removal) filed by Alcala Labs Inc.; Filed By: Alcala Labs Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Alcala Labs Inc.; Filed By: Alcala Labs Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/03/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Martin, Dominick. Refers to: Alcala Labs Inc; Filed By: Martin, Dominick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Martin, Dominick. Refers to: Alcala Labs Inc; Filed By: Martin, Dominick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Martin, Dominick. Refers to: Alcala Labs Inc; Filed By: Martin, Dominick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT J