This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/28/2020 at 01:50:51 (UTC).

Mark Anthony D Lanozga vs Regidor Pacal

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Mark Anthony D Lanozga filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Regidor Pacal. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Lanozga, Mark Anthony D

Lanozga, Mark Anthony D.

Respondent

Pacal, Regidor

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-61; Event Type: Hearing on Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 07/22/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 04/27/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Lanozga, Mark Anthony D.. Filed By: Lanozga, Mark Anthony D. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Lanozga, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 04/27/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/30/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/09/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Lanozga, Mark Anthony D. Filed By: Lanozga, Mark Anthony D. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service) filed by Lanozga, Mark Anthony D. Filed By: Lanozga, Mark Anthony D. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Lanozga, Mark Anthony D. Refers to: Lanozga, Irene; Pacal, Regidor Filed By: Lanozga, Mark Anthony D. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lanozga, Mark Anthony D. Refers to: Pacal, Regidor Filed By: Lanozga, Mark Anthony D. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Lanozga, Mark Anthony D. Filed By: Lanozga, Mark Anthony D. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Lanozga, Mark Anthony D. Filed By: Lanozga, Mark Anthony D. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.