Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 02:13:38 (UTC).

Margaret Anne Hannegan vs Matthew John Egan

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 Margaret Anne Hannegan filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Matthew John Egan. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hannegan, Margaret Anne

Respondent

Egan, Matthew John

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketRestraining order as requested against Matthew John Egan was granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 08/28/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) filed by Hannegan, Margaret Anne. Refers to: Egan, Matthew Filed By: Hannegan, Margaret Anne (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (Affidavit of unsuccessful service) filed by Hannegan, Margaret Anne. Filed By: Hannegan, Margaret Anne (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Hannegan, Margaret Anne. Filed By: Hannegan, Margaret Anne (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 08/28/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 03/19/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/27/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Hannegan, Margaret Anne. Filed By: Hannegan, Margaret Anne (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Hannegan, Margaret Anne. Refers to: Obrien, Megan; Egan, Frank; Egan, Matthew Filed By: Hannegan, Margaret Anne (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hannegan, Margaret Anne. Refers to: Obrien, Megan; Egan, Frank; Egan, Matthew Filed By: Hannegan, Margaret Anne (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Hannegan, Margaret Anne. Filed By: Hannegan, Margaret Anne (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Hannegan, Margaret Anne. Filed By: Hannegan, Margaret Anne (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 02/27/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less