This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/20/2022 at 08:04:39 (UTC).

Mardian Equipment Co Inc vs Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Mardian Equipment Co Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Pacific Ship Repair Fabrication Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mardian Equipment Co Inc

Defendant

Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Murray, Michael K.

625 The City Drive South 190

Orange, CA 92868

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mardian Equipment Co Inc. Refers to: Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Mardian Equipment Co Inc. Refers to: Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mardian Equipment Co Inc. Refers to: Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Mardian Equipment Co Inc. Refers to: Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mardian Equipment Co Inc. Refers to: Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc; Filed By: Mardian Equipment Co Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/24/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/24/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Mardian Equipment Co Inc. Refers to: Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc; Filed By: Mardian Equipment Co Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mardian Equipment Co Inc. Refers to: Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc; Filed By: Mardian Equipment Co Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mardian Equipment Co Inc. Refers to: Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc; Filed By: Mardian Equipment Co Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURRAY, MICHAEL K